Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-mj-01480
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 2:31 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Guillermo Esquivel (1)
Represented By
Daniel Joakin Garcia
Law Office Of Daniel J. Garcia
contact info
Material Witness
Deysi Noemy Torres-Moreno
Represented By
Alejandro Guerra
Law Office Of Alejandro Guerra
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Avery Dalton Benitez
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/28/2024 3:18 AM CDT
Sunday, August 25, 2024
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jose Guillermo Esquivel (1), filed. Initial Appearance set for 8/26/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano (oao7)
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Deysi Noemy Torres-Moreno as to Jose Guillermo Esquivel Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 8/26/2024 at 09:01 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano, filed. (oao7)
Related: [-]