Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Danny C Reeves
Referred: Candace J Smith
Case #: 2:24-cv-00137
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Case in other court:Campbell County Circuit Court, 24-CI-00565
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 3:25 AM EST
Defendant
Walmart Supercenter #1961
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Snead
Barnes Maloney Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Jennifer Kincaid Adams
Blackburn, Domene & Burchett PLLC
contact info
Aris L. Rogers
Blackburn Domene And Burchett, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Snead
Barnes Maloney Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Jennifer Kincaid Adams
Blackburn, Domene & Burchett PLLC
contact info
Aris L. Rogers
Blackburn Domene And Burchett, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bert Little
Represented By
Benjamin J. Fooks
The Law Offices Of Blake R. Maislin, Llc - Ky
contact info
Richard P. Gabelman
Richard P. Gabelman
contact info


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
33 33 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/17 2:53 PM
ORDER: This matter is STAYED until July 16, 2025, or once a motion for substitution is tendered. If no such motion is made, this matter will be dismissed pursuant to Rule 25(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 4/17/2025. (TBB)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Other Notice Thu 04/17 1:17 PM
NOTICE by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc. Notice of Plaintiff's Death (Adams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
31 31 2 pgs order Order Terminate Motions Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 04/14 8:57 AM
ORDER: 1. The motion to clarify30 , is GRANTED, in part. 2. By Monday April 28, 2025, Plaintiff Bert Little is DIRECTED to file a notice of intent to proceed pro se or otherwise SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Failure to comply SHALL RESULT in dismissal of this case. 3. This matter, including all discovery and dispositive motion deadlines, is STAYED until April 28, 2025, or once Little submits a notice of intent to proceed pro se whichever is earlier. A new scheduling order will subsequently be entered if necessary. 4. The Clerk is directed to provide a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Bert Little. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 4/14/2025. (TBB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
30 30 3 pgs motion Clarify Mon 04/07 1:24 PM
MOTION to Clarify by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc. Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Rogers, Aris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/12 3:25 PM
ORDER: 1. The motion to withdraw28 , is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to terminate attorney Gabelman as counsel of record for the plaintiff. 2. This matter is STAYED for up to 30 days during which time Plaintiff Little may have new counsel enter an appearance on his behalf. 3. If new counsel does not enter an appearance on Plaintiff Littles behalf on or before Friday, April 11, 2025, Little will have elected to proceed pro se (that is, without counsel) by default and the stay will be lifted. 4. The Clerk is directed to provide a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Bert Little. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 03/12/2025. (SLG)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/12 12:35 PM
SECOND MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bert Little Second
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (Gabelman, Richard
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/11 4:13 PM
ORDER: The motion to withdraw25 and the proposed agreed order26 , docketed as a motion, are DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 3/11/2025. (TBB)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs motion Proposed Agreed Order Tue 03/11 1:18 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re25 by Bert Little. (Gabelman, Richard) Modified on 3/11/2025 (TBB)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/11 1:10 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Bert Little Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Gabelman, Richard) Modified on 3/11/2025 (TBB). (TBB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/11/2025) Proposed Order
notice Notice of Docket Modification Tue 03/11 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Richard P. Gabelman re25 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel; Error: the proposed order26 was incorrectly filed as a separate entry using the event [motion/proposed agreed order]. Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the docket text of26 to state PROPOSED ORDER; clerk attached the proposed order to the Motion to Withdraw25 ; In the future, file the proposed order as an attachment to the motion instead of making a separate entry. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (TBB)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
24 24 misc Status Report Mon 03/03 11:34 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc.. (Adams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order Terminate Motions Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 02/25 8:37 AM
ORDER: 1. The plaintiff's motion21 is GRANTED in part. The deadline for the plaintiff's identification of experts and their reports is extended through April 1, 2025. Likewise, the deadline for the defendants' identification of experts and their reports is extended through May 30, 2025. The plaintiff's motion is DENIED regarding all other deadlines. 2. The Scheduling Order8 remain in effect in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 2/25/2025.(TBB)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
22 22 motion Proposed Agreed Order Mon 02/24 1:03 PM
Proposed Order by Bert Little. (Gabelman, Richard) Modified on 2/24/2025 (TBB)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/24 12:54 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND EXPERT REPORT DEADLINE by Bert Little Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Gabelman, Richard) Modified text on 2/24/2025 (TBB). (TBB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/24/2025) Proposed Order
notice Notice of Docket Modification Mon 02/24 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Richard P. Gabelman re22 Proposed Agreed Order by Bert Little Error: the proposed order22 was incorrectly filed as a separate entry using the event [motion/proposed agreed order]. Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the docket text of22 to state PROPOSED ORDER; clerk attached the proposed order to the Motion to Extend Expert Report Deadline21 ; In the future, file the proposed order as an attachment to the motion instead of making a separate entry. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (TBB)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
20 20 misc Status Report Mon 02/03 10:03 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc.. (Adams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
notice Notice for Attorney to Update Address Mon 02/03 10:35 AM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE EMAIL ADDRESS to Richard P. Gabelman: It appears the email address listed on your filing20 Joint Status Report is different than the email address registered with our Court. Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your email address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR, Via U.S. Mail to Richard P. Gabelman (TDB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aris L. Rogers on behalf of Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc. (Rogers, Aris)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
18 18 misc Status Report Mon 01/06 9:36 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc.. (Adams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
17 17 notice Other Notice Tue 12/10 11:39 AM
NOTICE by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Adams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 12/02 3:55 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc.. (Adams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
15 15 misc Status Report Mon 11/04 10:28 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc.. (Adams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 10/07 8:46 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc.. (Adams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 10/04 12:31 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting12 FIRST MOTION to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/4/2024. (TBB)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 10/04 11:36 AM
FIRST MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bert Little FIrst Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Gabelman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
10 10 respoth Notice of Appearance Tue 09/17 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bert Little. (Gabelman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
9 9 order Protective Order Tue 09/10 11:18 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER: The following restrictions and procedures shall apply to all documents, materials, testimony, discovery responses, and any other information which may be produced or given by any party to this litigation that are designated by counsel for that party as confidential. This Agreed Protective Order applies to any and all Confidential Materials produced by or on behalf of any of the parties to this litigation. (Parties to comply with 1-13 of this Order.) Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/10/2024.(TBB)
Related: [-]
8 8 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 09/10 11:10 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) Parties to exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures w/in 14 days. (2) Expert witness list: Plaintiff: February 28, 2025; Defendants April 30, 2025. (3) Supplementation due w/in 30 days of the discovery of new information, but NLT 30 prior to close of discovery. (4) Discovery due NLT June 13, 2025. (5) All discovery disputes are referred to Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith. (random draw) (6) All motions for extensions of time are referred to the undersigned. (7) Extensions require approval of the Court. (8) Motions to amend pleadings/join additional parties due NLT February 28, 2025. (9) Dispositive motions/Daubert motions due by July 11, 2025. (10) PT filings due by November 4, 2025. (11) NLT November 4, 2025, counsel directed to pre-mark all exhibits.(12) Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions due by November 11, 2025. (13) Objections to use of deposition or admissibility of exhibits shall be filed NLT November 18, 2025. (14) PT filings shall be submitted to the undersigned via email. (15) NLT November 18, 2025 parties shall submit each exhibit to chambers. (16) JURY TRIAL set for Tuesday, December 2, 2025 at 09:00 AM in COVINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves. Counsel to be present at 8:30 a.m. Estimated trial length is 3 days. (17) Parties may request pretrial conference. (18) Parties directed to file joint status report the first Monday of each month. (19) Parties directed to use a private mediator in the event they seek to mediate their dispute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/10/2024. (TBB)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 09/10 9:25 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Snead, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Proposed Agreed Order Tue 09/10 9:24 AM
Proposed Agreed Order Agreed Protective Order by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc.. (Snead, Christopher)
Related: [-]
notice Notice for Attorney to Update Address Tue 09/10 11:24 AM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to Richard P. Gabelman: It appears the address listed on filing6 Proposed Agreed Order Agreed Protective Order by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc. is different than the address registered with our Court. Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (TBB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order For Meeting and Report Wed 08/28 10:57 AM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within thirty (30) days, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f) to discuss the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a proposed discovery plan. 2. At meeting, parties exchanges disclosures required; 3. Within fourteen (14) days after meeting, parties file a written joint report outlining proposed discovery (see a-i). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/28/2024. (TBB) cc: COR (Benjamin Fooks by US Mail) (TBB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/28/2024) MJ Consent Form
4 4 notice Attorney Notice Wed 08/28 10:33 AM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Benjamin J. Fooks by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2(TBB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 83.1,
Att: 2 Rule 83.2
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Wed 08/28 10:24 AM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc. (TBB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 08/28 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Campbell County Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-00565. (Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5912639), filed by Walmart, Inc., Walmart Supercenter #1961.(TBB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Discovery Responses,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - State Court Record,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Conflict Check Wed 08/28 10:20 AM
Conflict Check run. (TBB)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/28 10:29 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Supercenter #1961, Walmart, Inc. (Filed as part of State Court Record re: Notice of Removal1 - Attachment #3 Exhibit C - State Court Record).(TBB)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Wed 08/28 10:41 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review:1 Notice of Removal, (TBB)
Related: [-]