New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: J Brendan Day
Case #: 3:24-cv-08804
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Case in other court:SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, SOMERSET COUNTY, SOM L 998 24
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 3:38 AM EST
Defendant
FOUNDATION FITNESS, LLC
Defendant
STAGES INDOOR CYCLING, LLC
Defendant
SPIA CYCLING, INC.
Defendant
GIANT BICYCLE, INC.
Represented By
THOMAS M. HINCHEY
Campbell, Conroy & O'Neil PC
contact info
YASHA KHATIB SHAHIDI
Campbell Conroy & O'Neil, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ABC THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS 1-10
Defendant
LIFETIME, INC.
Represented By
SAMUEL M. GOFFINET
Ahmuty Demers & Mcmanus, Esqs.
contact info
MICHAEL C. SALVO
Ahmuty, Demers & Mcmanus, Esqs.
contact info
Notice Only
arbtre
Plaintiff
LOUIS GIACOMAZZA
Represented By
JOHN ANTHONY BLYTH
Hach Rose Schirripa & Cheverie
contact info
Third Party Defendant
ABC THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS 1-10
Third Party Defendant
GIANT BICYCLE, INC.
Third Party Defendant
SPIA CYCLING, INC.
Represented By
THOMAS M. HINCHEY
Campbell, Conroy & O'Neil PC
contact info
YASHA KHATIB SHAHIDI
Campbell Conroy & O'Neil, P.C.
contact info
Third Party Plaintiff
LIFETIME, INC.
Represented By
SAMUEL M. GOFFINET
Ahmuty Demers & Mcmanus, Esqs.
contact info
MICHAEL C. SALVO
Ahmuty, Demers & Mcmanus, Esqs.
contact info
Third Party Plaintiff
LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
SAMUEL M. GOFFINET
Ahmuty Demers & Mcmanus, Esqs.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Third Party Defendant
FOUNDATION FITNESS, LLC
Terminated: 01/24/2025
Third Party Defendant
STAGES INDOOR CYCLING, LLC
Terminated: 01/24/2025


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
37 37 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/02 1:55 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint status letter dated 5/1/25 (Dkt.36 ) requesting an extension to the fact discovery deadline. The request is granted in part; the deadline to complete fact discovery at this time is extended to 8/1/25. The Court will hold a telephone status conference on 7/16/25 at 3:00 p.m.; dial-in information will be provided to counsel. No later than three (3) business days before the telephone status conference, the parties shall file a joint letter via CM/ECF, not to exceed three (3) pages, that summarizes the status of discovery and identifies any issues ripe for discussion with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 5/2/2025. (cry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
36 36 misc Status Report Thu 05/01 10:56 AM
STATUS REPORT by LIFETIME, INC., LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC.. (GOFFINET, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
35 35 order Stipulation and Order Wed 04/30 10:58 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal against 3rd party Defendants SPIA CYCLING INC. AND GIANT BICYCLE, INC. without prejudice. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/30/2025. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
34 34 misc Stipulation Tue 04/29 4:21 PM
STIPULATION Of Dismissal without Prejudice by ABC THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS 1-10. (SHAHIDI, YASHA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
33 33 order Text Order Thu 04/10 8:57 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' status letter dated 4/9/25 (Dkt.32 ) requesting an extension to allow the parties to conclude their ongoing discussions regarding the potential dismissal of Giant and SPIA from this action. The request is granted. On or before 5/2/25 , the parties shall file via CM/ECF a joint letter apprising the Court of the status of this issue. The Court will take appropriate action upon receipt of the letter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 4/10/2025. (cry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
32 32 misc Status Report Wed 04/09 3:22 PM
STATUS REPORT by GIANT BICYCLE, INC., SPIA CYCLING, INC.. (SHAHIDI, YASHA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
31 31 order Text Order Mon 03/10 1:12 PM
TEXT ORDER: Upon review of the 3/7/25 letter filed by third-party defendants SPIA Cycling Inc. and Giant Bicycle, Inc. (Dkt.30 ), the Court's prior text orders (Dkts. 22 , 28 ) shall remain in force at this time. The parties shall file another status report on or before 4/9/25. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 3/10/2025. (cry)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
30 30 misc Letter Fri 03/07 3:59 PM
Letter from Yasha K. Shahidi. (SHAHIDI, YASHA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
29 29 misc Letter Wed 02/19 8:15 AM
Letter from Yasha K. Shahidi. (SHAHIDI, YASHA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
28 28 order Text Order Tue 02/18 4:49 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court's 2/4/25 text order (Dkt. 22 ) shall apply in all respects to third-party defendant Giant Bicycle, Inc. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 2/18/2025. (cry)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
27 27 misc Letter Fri 02/14 2:20 PM
Letter from Yasha K. Shahidi. (SHAHIDI, YASHA)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 02/14 2:16 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Giant Bicycle's Rule 6.1.. (SHAHIDI, YASHA)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/14 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS M. HINCHEY on behalf of GIANT BICYCLE, INC. (HINCHEY, THOMAS) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/14 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by YASHA KHATIB SHAHIDI on behalf of GIANT BICYCLE, INC. (SHAHIDI, YASHA) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Seal - Restricted Document (non-confidential) Fri 02/14 4:19 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Thomas Hinchey and Yasha Shahidi have designated as confidential materials and restricted access to the Notices of Appearance24 &25 filed on 2/14/2025. These documents do not appear to be the subject of a motion or order. Please submit a certification stating that these documents are to be marked Confidential Material or that access was restricted in error. Please be advised, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3, you must file a motion for leave to have a document sealed. (eaj, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/06 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS M. HINCHEY on behalf of SPIA CYCLING, INC. (HINCHEY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
22 22 order Text Order Tue 02/04 4:19 PM
TEXT ORDER: Defendant Spia Cycling Inc.'s (Spia) deadline to respond to the third-party complaint is adjourned sine die ; any defenses that Spia may have, including jurisdictional defenses, are expressly preserved. Plaintiff and defendant Lifetime shall continue with written discovery at this time. The parties shall file via CM/ECF a joint status letter on or before 3/7/25. The Court will take appropriate action upon receipt of that letter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 2/4/2025. (cry)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 02/04 2:56 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to SPIA Cycling Inc... (SHAHIDI, YASHA)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by YASHA KHATIB SHAHIDI on behalf of SPIA CYCLING, INC. (SHAHIDI, YASHA)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 02/04 4:18 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day: Telephone Conference held on 2/4/2025. (cry)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
19 19 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 01/24 11:05 AM
PARTIAL STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Third-party Defendants FOUNDATION FITNESS, LLC. and STAGES INDOOR CYCLING, LLC. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/24/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
18 18 misc Stipulation Thu 01/23 9:21 AM
STIPULATION by LIFETIME, INC..(GOFFINET, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit partial stipulation
Thursday, January 16, 2025
17 17 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 01/16 10:05 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference set for 1/16/25 is rescheduled to 2/4/25 at 3:30 p.m.; dial-in information remains the same. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 1/16/2025. (cry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Wed 01/15 10:26 AM
Letter from John Blyth, Esq.. (BLYTH, JOHN)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Wed 01/15 10:08 AM
Letter from Samuel Goffinet, Esq.. (GOFFINET, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
14 14 service Summons Issued Fri 01/10 3:24 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to FOUNDATION FITNESS, LLC, GIANT BICYCLE, INC., SPIA CYCLING, INC., and STAGES INDOOR CYCLING, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mlh)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons - Request for Issue Fri 01/10 10:40 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by LIFETIME, INC. as to All Defendants.(GOFFINET, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit stages indoor cycling,
Att: 2 Exhibit foundation fitness,
Att: 3 Exhibit spia cycling,
Att: 4 Exhibit gian bycycle
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
12 12 19 pgs cmp Third Party Complaint Wed 01/08 1:11 PM
First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against STAGES INDOOR CYCLING, LLC, FOUNDATION FITNESS, LLC, SPIA CYCLING, INC., GIANT BICYCLE, INC., ABC THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS 1-10, filed by LIFETIME, INC..(GOFFINET, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/06 3:15 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion File and serve third-party complaint within 5 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 1/6/2025. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 12/13 1:58 PM
MOTION File and serve third-party complaint by LIFETIME, INC..(GOFFINET, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief legal brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order,
Att: 3 Certification certification of counsel,
Att: 4 Exhibit ex 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit ex 2
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/13 4:06 PM
Set Deadlines as to10 MOTION File and serve third-party complaint . Motion set for 1/6/2025 before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/16 4:34 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/16/2025 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day. Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2024. Fact Discovery due by 4/11/2025. Parties shall file a joint status letter by 1/13/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 10/16/2024. (amv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Fri 10/11 2:42 PM
Letter from the Parties. (SALVO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
7 7 order Text Order Tue 10/01 10:36 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to engage in informal discovery at this time in aid of early settlement efforts. On or before 10/15/24, the parties shall file via CM/ECF a joint letter apprising the Court of the status of settlement discussions. The Court will take appropriate action upon receipt of the letter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 10/1/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 10/01 10:35 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/30/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
6 6 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 09/17 2:54 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by LIFETIME, INC..(GOFFINET, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Entry of Appearance Tue 09/17 4:11 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, when entering a first appearance in a case, counsel should add their name when prompted. The Clerks office has added SAMUEL M. GOFFINET as representing LIFETIME, INC. in this case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (kht)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
5 5 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 08/30 11:38 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2024 at 3:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 8/30/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/29 10:21 AM
LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY INC. d/b/a LIFE TIME FITNESS (i/s/a LIFE TIME, INC.) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by LIFETIME, INC..(SALVO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 08/28 3:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIFETIME, INC. identifying LIFE TIME GROUP HOLDINGS, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (SALVO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Exhibit (to Document) Wed 08/28 3:39 PM
Exhibit to1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by LIFETIME, INC.. (SALVO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 08/28 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIFETIME, INC. d/b/a LIFETIME FITNESS LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC. d/b/a LIFETIME FITNESS (i/s/a LIFE TIME, INC.) from Somerset County Vicinage, case number SOM-L-998-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15622424), filed by LIFETIME, INC. d/b/a LIFETIME FITNESS.(SALVO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Wed 08/28 3:25 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: D/B/A parties should be added as an ALIAS . Please do not enter them in the First or Last Name Fields . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Wed 08/28 3:26 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/28 3:29 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 08/28 3:32 PM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (kht)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Wed 08/28 3:36 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (kht)
Related: [-]