Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-04702
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 4:01 AM EST
Defendant
3M Company Inc
Plaintiff
Jason Whitson
Represented By
John Benochi
Benochi Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Wed 08/28 3:52 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 08/28/2024), Jason Whitson v. 3M Company Inc, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04702-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: District of South Carolina (wmil)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 08/28 3:51 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil)
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 08/28 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BSCDC-11960329.), filed by Jason Whitson. Service due by 11/26/2024 (wmil)
Related: [-]