Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Case #: 1:24-cv-23281
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2024
Terminated:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 4:50 AM EST
Defendant
Embark General Insurance Agency, LLC
Plaintiff
Contrell Leo Floyd
1321 NW 13th Street
Miami, FL 33128
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jesus Despaigne Rojas
Terminated: 10/01/2024

GPO Aug 30 2024
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. ORDER denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is DENIED. The Complaint [ECF No. 1] is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by September 30, 2024. That amended complaint must comply with our Local Rules, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and this Order. This will be the Plaintiff's final opportunity to state a claim, and we will not accept any filings in this case after September 30, 2024. By that same date, the Plaintiff must file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that is completely and accurately filled out. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively CLOSE this case. Amended Complaint due by 9/30/2024. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
10 10 6 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 10/09 2:11 PM
ORDER. The Amended Complaint [ECF No.7 ] is DISMISSED without leave to amend. All motions, including the renewed Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis [ECF No.9 ], are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/8/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
9 9 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/01 11:26 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contrell Leo Floyd. (nan)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) to receive Notices of Electronic Filing Tue 10/01 11:24 AM
Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Contrell Leo Floyd to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: contrellfloyd13@gmail.com (nan)
Related: [-]
7 7 11 pgs cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Tue 10/01 11:19 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Embark General Insurance Agency, LLC, filed by Contrell Leo Floyd.(nan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Friday, August 30, 2024
6 6 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/30 3:08 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. ORDER denying3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is DENIED. The Complaint [ECF No.1 ] is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by September 30, 2024. That amended complaint must comply with our Local Rules, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and this Order. This will be the Plaintiff's final opportunity to state a claim, and we will not accept any filings in this case after September 30, 2024. By that same date, the Plaintiff must file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that is completely and accurately filled out. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively CLOSE this case. Amended Complaint due by 9/30/2024. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 08/30 3:10 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (nan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant Fri 08/30 3:05 PM
ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
4 4 misc Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) to receive Notices of Electronic Filing Wed 08/28 10:41 AM
Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Contrell Leo Floyd to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: contrellfloyd13@gmail.com (drz)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 08/28 10:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contrell Leo Floyd. (drz)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 08/28 10:39 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 08/28 10:37 AM
COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGE against Jesus Despaigne Rojas. Filing fees $ 405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Contrell Leo Floyd.(drz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet