Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-04678
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2024
Case in other court:New York Southern, 1:24-cv-06007
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 5:07 AM EST
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
individually and as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
The 3M Company
Represented By
Jordan David Sagalowsky
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1- 20
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation; 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Plaintiff
Dale Stone
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eva Swint
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Swineheart
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marion Sweeney
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Funicello Suggs
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Walter Sturdivant
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Glenn Strunk
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Albert Strain
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Strader
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Stone
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Swofford
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rosa Stokes
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
D'Licia Stokes
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Stoker
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Allan Stockstill
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rodney Stockman
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathleen Stipp
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Larry Stiles
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Steward
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly Taylor
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of George Sungy
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Rockingham Smith
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Smith
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mikel Smith
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Vickie Taylor
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Suzanne Taylor
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen Taylor
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marchsha Taylor
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lillian Taylor
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Stevenson
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward Taylor
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christine Taylor
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chelsea Taylor
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Tate
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond Tardif
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ruben Tapia
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Tamborello
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Tackett
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Sorrell
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Spilker
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gilbert Speelman
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shawn Dale Spears
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Spears
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne A. Spaid, Jr
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Morris Southern
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Terry Southard
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dustree South
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Soule
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hubert Spires
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ira Solomon
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Solice
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Snyder
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Snyder
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Clay Snyder
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Snider
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Smolinski
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Roy Smith, Jr
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Roderick Stalvey
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond Stevenson
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Sterwald
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Sterner
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Sterling
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dale Stephens
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Stempien
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Stancil
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eugene Stanchfield
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mitchell Smith
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Stager
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dean Staal
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven St.Andre
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John St John, Sr
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Square
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Sprowls
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cecil Spraggins
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Darwin Spradlin
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/10 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Welch, Mickey Wells, Eddie Wilson, Clay Snyder, Ronald Snyder, Ricky Wagstaff NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-06684-RMG, 2:24-cv-04678-RMG, 2:24-cv-04679-RMG, 2:24-cv-04680-RMG(Mindicino, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/10 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Raymond Tardif, Larry Bynum, Neal Nesset, Laurie Urias, Timothy Waldrep, Gloria Mendoza NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, September 05, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 09/05 3:58 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rhei, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
7 7 misc MDL Member Case Opened Thu 08/29 9:53 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:24-cv-06007, Smith et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04678 (jbin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 08/28 1:23 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-06007. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
5 5 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/26/2024) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
Related: [-]
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
4 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated May 28, 2024;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated May 28, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated May 28, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
Related: [-]
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
3 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) Modified on 8/8/2024 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152278/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29720032).Document filed by The 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/28/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial