Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:24-bk-32579
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Oct 15, 2024
Terminated:Dec 03, 2024

Debtor
Blade Craft Barber Academy LLC
5628 Tremont St
Dallas, TX 75214-4707
Represented By
Derek K. Prosser
Toronjo & Prosser Law
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Scott M. Seidel
Seidel Law Firm 6505 W. Park Blvd., Suite 306
Plano, TX 75093
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 08/29/2024 12:03 AM CDT
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
crditcrd none Wed 08/28 3:15 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload)([LINK 24-32579 7] ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00). Receipt number A31731602, amount $ 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 41 pgs caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (case upload) Wed 08/28 3:14 PM
Non-Individual Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload) filed by Derek K. Prosser of Toronjo & Prosser Law on behalf of Blade Craft Barber Academy LLC. (Prosser, Derek)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign Wed 08/28 11:00 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Seidel, Scott M. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/15/2024 at 09:00 AM via Zoom - Seidel: Meeting ID 852 364 7954, Passcode 5939858754, Phone 1-469-218-9145. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is future date. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]