Original Case: 3:16-cv-00764

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cvpri-02265
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Terminated:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2024 4:23 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
TWITTER, INC.
Represented By
Thomas Gregory Sprankling
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
contact info
David L. McCombs
Haynes and Boone, LLP
contact info
Sonal Naresh Mehta
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
VIDSTREAM LLC
Represented By
John Franklin Summers
Caldwell Cassady & Curry
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady & Curry
contact info
Jason Dodd Cassady
Caldwell Cassady & Curry
contact info
Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady & Curry
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady & Curry
contact info
Hamad M. Hamad
Caldwell Cassady & Curry
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/20/2024 4:22 AM EST
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 08/22/2024. [1028276] Entry of Appearance due 09/11/2024. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/11/2024. Docketing Statement due 09/11/2024. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 10/28/2024.--[Edited 08/28/2024 by KMH to correct deadlines] [KMH] [Entered: 08/28/2024 10:14 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 49 pgs Civil Case Docketed