Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mark A Kearney
Case #: 2:24-cv-04552
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2024
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
MORAVIA HEALTH
1500 WALNUT STREET, STE 1900
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19102
Represented By
Andrea Meryl Kirshenbaum
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
YATSKA MELENDEZ
4217 ORCHARD STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19124
Represented By
SIDNEY L. GOLD
The Gold Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
MARGARET C. KING
The Gold Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 10/09 9:48 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/9/24. 10/9/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs misc Letter Wed 10/09 9:00 AM
Letter dated 10/09/2024 by YATSKA MELENDEZ. (KING, MARGARET)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
9 9 order Order to Show Cause Mon 09/30 11:51 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE through a joint Memorandum filed by Plaintiff not exceeding five pages as to why we should not enter a L.R. 41.1 Order consistent with the Notice of tentative settlement8 DUE BY 10/15/2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON September 30, 2024. September 30, 2024 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(KEARNEY, MARK)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
8 8 1 pgs misc Letter Fri 09/27 2:44 PM
Letter dated 09/27/24 re: Status of Case by YATSKA MELENDEZ. (KING, MARGARET)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
7 7 1 pgs notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/19 2:27 PM
NOTICE by YATSKA MELENDEZ re6 Order PLAINTIFF'S STATUS REPORT OF ARBIRATION PROCESS PER COURT'S ORDER (KING, MARGARET)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Mon 09/09 4:13 PM
ORDER THAT THE5 STIPULATION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF ALL CLAIMS IN ARBITRATION IS APPROVED IN PART AS DETAILED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/9/24. 9/9/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs misc Stipulation Mon 09/09 12:40 PM
STIPULATION and Order to Stay Case Pending Arbitration by MORAVIA HEALTH. (Kirshenbaum, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
4 4 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/05 11:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by YATSKA MELENDEZ re: B&R served Summons and Complaint upon MORAVIA HEALTH by personal service. MORAVIA HEALTH served on 9/3/2024, answer due 9/24/2024. (GOLD, SIDNEY)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/30 7:54 AM
Summons Issued as to MORAVIA HEALTH. (lisad, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/30/2024) (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/29 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET C. KING on behalf of YATSKA MELENDEZ (KING, MARGARET)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 08/29 12:15 PM
COMPLAINT JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against MORAVIA HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17708633.), filed by YATSKA MELENDEZ.(GOLD, SIDNEY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Wage Agreement dated 05-05-23,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Wage Agreement dated 10-19-23,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Wage Agreement dated 10-30-23,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Wage Agreement dated 12-01-23