California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Dennis Montali
Case #: 4:24-bk-41317
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Sep 30, 2024
Claims Deadline:Nov 07, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Apr 23, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Red Bay Coffee Company, Inc.
3098 E 10th St
Oakland, CA 94601-2960
Represented By
Matthew D. Metzger
Belvedere Legal, PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Not Assigned - OK
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
145 145 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/02 1:48 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Red Bay Coffee Company, Inc. (Metzger, Matthew)
Related: [-] 142 Application for Compensation,143 Notice of Hearing
144 144 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/02 1:47 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Red Bay Coffee Company, Inc. (Metzger, Matthew)
Related: [-] 143 Notice of Hearing
143 143 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 05/02 1:46 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/23/2025 at 10:00 AM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Debtor Red Bay Coffee Company, Inc. (Metzger, Matthew)
Related: [-] 139 Application for Compensation for Mark M. Sharf, Trustee Chapter 11, Fee: $19866, Expenses: $0. Filed by Trustee Mark M. Sharf (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C),142 Application for Compensation ("First and Final Application for Allowance of Compensation and Expense Reimbursement Belvedere Legal, P.C. (August 29, 2024 May 1, 2025); Declaration of Matthew D. Metzger") for Matthew D. Metzger, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $103068.50, Expenses: $42704.62. Filed by Attorney Matthew D. Metzger (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Metzger)
142 142 motion Compensation Fri 05/02 1:44 PM
Application for Compensation ("First and Final Application for Allowance of Compensation and Expense Reimbursement Belvedere Legal, P.C. (August 29, 2024 May 1, 2025); Declaration of Matthew D. Metzger") for Matthew D. Metzger, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $103068.50, Expenses: $42704.62. Filed by Attorney Matthew D. Metzger (Metzger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Metzger
Thursday, May 01, 2025
141 141 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/01 6:29 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Trustee Mark M. Sharf (Sharf, Mark)
Related: [-] 139 Application for Compensation
140 140 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/01 3:03 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Trustee Mark M. Sharf (Sharf, Mark)
Related: [-] 139 Application for Compensation
139 139 motion Compensation Thu 05/01 12:37 PM
Application for Compensation for Mark M. Sharf, Trustee Chapter 11, Fee: $19866, Expenses: $0. Filed by Trustee Mark M. Sharf (Sharf, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, April 25, 2025
138 138 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc Order Confirming Plan Fri 04/25 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc Order Confirming Plan. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 135 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan
137 137 order Employ Fri 04/25 5:34 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Special Counsel [AER Legal] Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 111