Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian S Miller
Case #: 4:24-cv-00733
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2024
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Case in other court:Pulaski County Circuit Court, 60CV-24-06626
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 2:17 AM CST
Defendant
CAHB Operating LLC
Represented By
David D. Wilson
Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP
contact info
Devin R. Bates
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Mark R. Holland
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Central Arkansas House Buyers LLC
Represented By
David D. Wilson
Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP
contact info
Devin R. Bates
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Mark R. Holland
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Matt Lamb
Represented By
Hannah Elisabeth Webb Howard
Gill Ragon Owen P.A.
contact info
Dylan Hugh Potts
Gill Ragon Owen P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristen Chapin
Represented By
Dylan J. Botteicher
Cox, Sterling, Vandiver & Botteicher, PLLC
contact info

GPO Mar 07 2025
JUDGMENT: Consistent with 16 order entered today, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/7/2025. (ljb)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
17 17 order Judgment Fri 03/07 10:13 AM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with16 order entered today, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/7/2025. (ljb)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 03/07 10:11 AM
ORDER that pursuant to15 Kristen Chapin's notice of voluntary dismissal, her2 complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/7/2025. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
15 15 motion Dismiss Wed 02/12 12:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Botteicher, Dylan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/05 4:03 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/6/2026 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Joinder of Parties due by 10/14/2025; Discovery due by 11/12/2025; Motions due by 12/8/2025; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 3/6/2026. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/5/2024. (ljb)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 12/05 3:16 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Kristen Chapin. (Botteicher, Dylan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
12 12 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 11/22 1:41 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting11 motion to withdraw filed by Central Arkansas House Buyers LLC, CAHB Operating LLC. Attorney Devin R. Bates and Mark R. Holland terminated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/22/2024. (ljb)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 11/22 10:26 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Central Arkansas House Buyers LLC, CAHB Operating LLC (Holland, Mark)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Wilson on behalf of Central Arkansas House Buyers LLC, CAHB Operating LLC (Wilson, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
9 9 order Initial Scheduling Order Tue 09/24 10:58 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/2/2024; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/16/2024; Jury Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 4/6/2026 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/24/2024. (ljb)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/24 7:11 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury demand by Matt Lamb.(Potts, Dylan) (Docket text modified on 9/24/2024 to include reference to the jury demand)(jak)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/24 7:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Hugh Potts on behalf of Matt Lamb (Potts, Dylan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/24 7:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Elisabeth Webb Howard on behalf of Matt Lamb (Howard, Hannah)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Correction Tue 09/24 8:15 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re8 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include reference to the Jury demand as marked on the document. (jak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/29 3:05 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by CAHB Operating LLC, Central Arkansas House Buyers LLC.(Holland, Mark)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 08/29 2:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by CAHB Operating LLC, Central Arkansas House Buyers LLC, Matt Lamb (Holland, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Deficiency Letter Thu 08/29 1:38 PM
Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that1 Notice of Removal lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)) and a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 08/29 1:03 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kristen Chapin. (ajj)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 08/29 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CAHB Operating LLC, Central Arkansas House Buyers LLC from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV 24-6626 Fee of $405 paid. Receipt Number LIT7618. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet