Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey V Brown
Case #: 3:24-cv-00254
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 American Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 2:41 AM CST
Defendant
Jonathan and Angela of Christus Our Daily Bread
Plaintiff
Brandon James Angel-Crowell
420 W Spruce St Apt 7
Deming, NM 88030


Docket last updated: 08/29/2024 3:40 PM CDT
Thursday, August 29, 2024
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT against Jonathan and Angela of Christus Our Daily Bread filed by Brandon James Angel-Crowell. Application to Proceed IFP Granted on 8/29/2024 by Judge Jeffrey V Brown. (va3)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet