Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Nathaniel M Gorton
Case #: 1:24-cv-12241
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
CauseFamily and Medical Leave Act of 1993
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
Harris Heckelman
Represented By
Alexandra Held
Freeman Mathis & Gary
contact info
Jennifer L. Markowski
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc.
Represented By
Alexandra Held
Freeman Mathis & Gary
contact info
Jennifer L. Markowski
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dairyland USA Corporation
Represented By
Alexandra Held
Freeman Mathis & Gary
contact info
Jennifer L. Markowski
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Susanna McFarlane
Represented By
Patrick J. Hannon
Hartley Michon Robb Hannon LLP
contact info
Austin Walsh Smith
Hartley Michon Robb Hannon LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
25 25 minutes Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 04/18 2:29 PM
*NOT RECORDED* Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Telephone Conference held on 4/18/2025. Parties discuss proceeding with a mediation in person or via video in November 2025. Parties to pick a date. (Court Reporter: None.)(Attorneys present: Hannon; Markowski, Held) (DMK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of ADR Conference Thu 04/10 3:56 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of pre-ADR Phone Conference set for 4/18/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 Worcester Related [+] before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. Please be prepared to discuss the parties' position on participating in an in-person or video conference mediation as agreed upon dates in November 2025 as to present to the Court in order to schedule the mediation. *Call-in phone number will be emailed to counsel separately. (DMK) Modified on 4/10/2025 (DMK)
Related: [-] mote only
Friday, February 28, 2025
23 23 utility Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider Mon 03/03 10:44 AM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge David Hennessy appointed for a mediation date in November 2025.(MS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to ADR Thu 02/20 9:32 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mediation: November, 2025.(CML)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
21 21 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 02/20 9:27 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Scheduling Conference held by telephone on 2/19/2025: Automatic Discovery to be completed by 2/19/25; Amendments and/or Supplements to the Pleadings due by 5/31/2025; written Discovery to be served by 5/31/25, answered by 6/30/2025; fact depositions to be completed by 10/31/25; experts designated and Rule 26 Reports exchanged by 11/30/25, rebuttals by 12/31/25; dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2026, oppositions by 3/31/26. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2026 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (In person only) before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2026 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (In person only) before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Case to be referred to Mediation program: November, 2025. (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Hannon, Markowski, Held) (CML)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
20 20 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Mon 02/17 10:56 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Markowski, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
19 19 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/14 4:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc., Harris Heckelman, Dairyland USA Corporation. (Markowski, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
18 18 3 pgs discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Thu 02/13 11:07 PM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Joint statement re scheduling conference Thu 02/13 11:05 PM
JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
16 16 2 pgs notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Fri 01/17 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference, to be held by telephone, set for 2/19/2025 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (CML)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
15 15 13 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 12/11 5:14 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by Harris Heckelman.(Held, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
14 14 13 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 12/11 5:11 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by Dairyland USA Corporation.(Held, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
13 13 14 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 12/11 5:09 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc..(Held, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 12/10 10:12 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jessica D. Hedges. (Martin, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
11 11 1 pgs misc Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 12/09 4:51 PM
Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Hannon, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
10 10 misc Reminder to Submit Consent or Refusal of MJ Jurisdiction Fri 11/29 4:49 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/19 6:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Held on behalf of Dairyland USA Corporation, Harris Heckelman, The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc. (Held, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 11/19 6:33 PM
STIPULATION re5 Amended Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend The Time For Filing A Response To Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Dairyland USA Corporation, Harris Heckelman, The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc.. (Markowski, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/19 6:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Markowski on behalf of Dairyland USA Corporation, Harris Heckelman, The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc. (Markowski, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
6 6 1 pgs service Acknowledgment of Service Thu 11/14 3:57 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Susanna McFarlane. Dairyland USA Corporation served on 10/24/2024, answer due 11/14/2024; Harris Heckelman served on 10/24/2024, answer due 11/14/2024; The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc. served on 10/24/2024, answer due 11/14/2024. Acknowledgment filed by Susanna McFarlane. (Hannon, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
5 5 17 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/08 12:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dairyland USA Corporation, Harris Heckelman, The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc., filed by Susanna McFarlane.(Hannon, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 08/30 5:16 PM
Summons Issued as to Dairyland USA Corporation, Harris Heckelman, The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Fri 08/30 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jessica D. Hedges assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet Fri 08/30 11:56 AM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Susanna McFarlane.(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Form
Thursday, August 29, 2024
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/29 5:14 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number CMADC-10576801 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Susanna McFarlane.(Smith, Austin)
Related: [-]