Hall v. Communication Federal Credit Union
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Bernard M Jones |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00902 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 2:27 AM CST |
Defendant
Communication Federal Credit Union
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlotte Hall
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, January 06, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charlotte Hall (Federman, William) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER ~ Granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The answer/response date is extended to January 6, 2025. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 12/16/2024. (dwl) |
|
11 | 11
![]() FOURTH MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Communication Federal Credit Union. (Whatley, Nathan) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER ~ Granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Communication Federal Credit Union. The answer/response date is extended to December 16, 2024. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 11/7/2024. (dwl) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() THIRD MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Communication Federal Credit Union. (Whatley, Nathan) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER ~ Granting7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Communication Federal Credit Union answer due 11/13/2024. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 10/23/2024. (dwl) |
|
7 | 7
![]() SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Communication Federal Credit Union. (Whatley, Nathan) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER ~ Granting5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Communication Federal Credit Union answer due 10/23/2024. The answer/response date is extended to October 23, 2024. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/23/2024. (dwl) |
|
5 | 5
![]() UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Communication Federal Credit Union. (Whatley, Nathan) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan L Whatley on behalf of Communication Federal Credit Union (Whatley, Nathan) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by William B Federman on behalf of Charlotte Hall (Federman, William) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Fri 08/30 2:16 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BOKWDC-4510919. (Federman, William) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued Electronically as to Communication Federal Credit Union. (naa) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Communication Federal Credit Union filed by Charlotte Hall.(naa) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |