Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Anita B Brody
Case #: 2:24-cv-04585
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2024
Case in other court:Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, 2407M0032
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 3:38 AM EST
Defendant
May Fairmount, LLC
32 Cross Street
Lakewood, NJ 08701
Represented By
KEVIN C. MEACHAM
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
HEATHER RUSSELL FINE
contact info
THOMAS S. JONES
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pelco Builders, Inc.
699 Glenrose Road
Coatesville, PA 19320
Represented By
Lisa M Wampler
Cohen Seglias Pallas Greenhall & Furman
contact info
John Howard
Cohen Seglias Pallas Greenhall & Furman
contact info
LANE F. KELMAN
Cohen Seglias Pallas Greenhall & Furman PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
42 42 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 05/05 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/12/2025 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 7B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
41 41 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 04/28 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/14/2025 10:30 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PETER R. BRYANT on behalf of Pelco Builders, Inc.(BRYANT, PETER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
39 39 misc Letter Tue 04/15 4:13 PM
Letter dated April 15, 2025 by May Fairmount, LLC. (MEACHAM, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
38 38 notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Mon 04/14 9:31 AM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - Status, scheduled for 4/14/25(jwl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
37 37 misc Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Mon 04/07 9:28 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re36 Transcript - PDF,, 4/7/25 Entered & E-mailed. (fdc)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Transcript - PDF Mon 04/07 9:24 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/17/25, before Judge Brody. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jessica B. Cahill, Maukele Transcribers, LLC. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2025. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
35 35 minutes Status Conference Mon 03/17 1:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY. Re: A Status Conference was held (via telephone) on 3/17/25. (fdc)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 03/17 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/14/2025 10:30 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 03/11 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 3/17/2025 10:30 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
32 32 misc Letter Fri 02/21 8:42 AM
Letter dated 02/21/2025 by Pelco Builders, Inc.. (KELMAN, LANE)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/10 9:27 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE, ( STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/19/2025 10:30 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/9/25. 1/10/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
30 30 misc Letter Thu 01/09 12:30 PM
Letter dated 01/09/2025 by Pelco Builders, Inc.. (KELMAN, LANE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 01/02 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/15/2025 10:30 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Thu 01/02 8:26 AM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - Telephone Conference, scheduled for 1/6/25(jwl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 11/26 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/6/2025 10:00 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Tue 11/26 10:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY. Re: A Pretrial/Rule 16 Conference was held (via telephone) on 11/26/24. Court Reporter: ESR. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 11/25 9:36 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/26/2024 10:30 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Fri 11/22 12:50 PM
Letter dated 11/22/2024 by Pelco Builders, Inc.. (KELMAN, LANE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
23 23 discov Discovery Plan Tue 11/19 4:47 PM
Discovery Plan by May Fairmount, LLC.(FINE, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, November 07, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 11/07 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/26/2024 10:30 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 11/06 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 CONFERENCE CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 11/25/2024 AT 10:30 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/31 11:14 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF THOMAS S. JONES, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/30/24. 10/31/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/31 10:01 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF KEVIN C. MEACHAM, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/30/24. 10/31/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
18 18 misc Statement Wed 10/30 3:41 PM
Statement of Disclosure Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Pelco Builders, Inc.. (Wampler, Lisa)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 10/30 1:54 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin C. Meacham by May Fairmount, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17847187.). (FINE, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/30 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M Wampler on behalf of Pelco Builders, Inc. (Wampler, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 10/29 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 11/14/2024 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
14 14 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 10/15 4:18 PM
RESPONSE in Support re8 MOTION to Remand filed by Pelco Builders, Inc..(KELMAN, LANE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Lane Kelman
Friday, October 04, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/04 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Howard on behalf of Pelco Builders, Inc. (Howard, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
12 12 9 pgs respm Memorandum Thu 10/03 3:29 PM
Memorandum of Law, in Opposition re8 MOTION to Remand filed by May Fairmount, LLC.(FINE, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, September 27, 2024
11 11 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 09/27 1:14 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Jones by May Fairmount, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17774011.). (FINE, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 09/23 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/13/2024 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/23/2024) (fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/19 4:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pelco Builders, Inc.. (KELMAN, LANE)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Remand Thu 09/19 12:35 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by Pelco Builders, Inc..memorandum, declaration, certificate of service.(KELMAN, LANE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A (seg 1) to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A (seg. 2) to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A (seg. 3) to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit H (seg. 1) to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit H (seg. 2) to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit H (seg. 3) to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit I to Declaration of Lane Kelman,
Att: 14 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 13, 2024
7 7 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint) Fri 09/13 3:47 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by May Fairmount, LLC. (Amendment to its Notice of Removal) .(FINE, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Part 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Part 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Part 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit A - Part 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit A - Part 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit A - Part 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit B
Monday, September 09, 2024
6 6 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 09/09 5:22 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Fairmount Owner, LLC and 650 Fairmount JV, LLC by May Fairmount, LLC.(FINE, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
5 5 trial Exhibit Fri 09/06 9:59 AM
EXHIBIT 4 by May Fairmount, LLC..(FINE, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata Exhibit 4 (Part 2),
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (Part 3),
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (Part 4),
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (Part 5)
Thursday, September 05, 2024
4 4 motion Dismiss Thu 09/05 4:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by May Fairmount, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(FINE, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/03 1:39 PM
ORDER THAT May Fairmount, LLC is to file their disclosure statement on or before September 10, 2024.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/3/24. 9/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc State Court Record - Attachment Tue 09/03 1:28 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County.(CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2 of Full file 2407M0032,
Att: 2 Part 3 of Full file 2407M0032,
Att: 3 Part 4 of Full file 2407M0032,
Att: 4 Part 5 of Full file 2407M0032
Thursday, August 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Thu 08/29 5:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by May Fairmount, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17710188), filed by May Fairmount, LLC.(FINE, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form Designation Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A