Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:24-cv-00711
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2024
Terminated:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 2:30 AM CST
Defendant
Chubbies, Inc.
Represented By
Neil J McNabnay
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Alexander Hale Martin
Fish & Richardson
contact info
Plaintiff
Linfo IP, LLC
Represented By
William P Ramey, III
Ramey LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Monday, October 28, 2024
13 13 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 10/28 1:14 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (KLC)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 10/28 1:12 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/26/2024. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/18 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Linfo IP, LLC (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 09/16 1:01 PM
ORDER granting9 JOINT MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/16/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
9 9 motion Stay Fri 09/13 4:39 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by Chubbies, Inc..(Martin, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 09/13 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Hale Martin on behalf of Chubbies, Inc. (Martin, Alexander)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 09/13 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricardo Joel Bonilla on behalf of Chubbies, Inc. (Bonilla, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 09/13 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Chubbies, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/29 5:01 PM
NOTICE Notice of Related Cases by Linfo IP, LLC(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 08/29 4:53 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Chubbies, Inc.. (CH)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 08/29 4:52 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Linfo IP, LLC (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 08/29 4:46 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/29 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Chubbies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10328301.), filed by Linfo IP, LLC.(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/29 4:46 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (CH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 08/29 4:46 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CH)
Related: [-]