Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:24-cv-01605
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, October 04, 2024
4 4 motion Motion Appointment of Counsel Fri 10/04 11:46 AM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff William Lewis West. (GA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
3 3 minord Pro Se Correspondence Minute Order Thu 09/12 8:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/11/2024. By Deputy Clerk: R. Gador. Documents submitted by: William L. West. CASE STATUS INQUIRIES - The Court will notify you as soon as any action is taken in your case. Due to the large number of civil actions pending before the Court, THE CLERK IS UNABLE TO RESPOND IN WRITING TO INDIVIDUAL INQUIRIES REGARDING THE STATUS OF YOUR CASE. If you keep the Court apprised of your current address, you will receive all Court decisions which might affect the status of your case. If you have not submitted a document required in your case, the Court will notify you. CASE STATUS INQUIRIES - CASE IN SCREENING - Before the court is your letter requesting status. As the court clerk advised you in the Advisory Letter confirming receipt of your initial filings, due to the large number of inmate civil rights actions pending before the court, the court is unable to respond in writing to individual inquiries regarding the status of your case. Plaintiff is advised, however, that your case is in line for screening. Plaintiff must await the court's initial review of cases filed ahead of yours which are being addressed at present. As long as you keep the court apprised of your current address, you will receive all court decisions which might affect the status of your case. MOTIONS - A document requesting a court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter. See Local Rule IA 10-2. Letters to a judge will be disregarded. See Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7. LEGAL ADVICE - Neither the court nor the clerks office can give legal advice. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Fri 08/30 11:00 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/30 10:57 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William Lewis West.(CAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint