Colorado District Court
Judge:S Kato Crews
Referred: Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:24-cv-02401
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12111 - Americans With Disabilities Act - Employment
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2024
Terminated:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 1:20 AM MST
Defendant
BAE Systems Space & Missions Systems, Inc.
Defendant
Ball Aerospace & Technologies Corp.
Defendant
Lisa Becker
Plaintiff
Mary Lee Taylor
Represented By
Cynthia Jeannet Sanchez
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info
Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago
Friday, October 11, 2024
9 9 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Fri 10/11 7:11 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to 8 Order. Text Only Entry. (jrobe, )
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Fri 10/11 8:50 AM
ORDER This matter is before the Court on the7 Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice, which is a self-effectuating stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff's claims were dismissed with prejudice as of the filing of the Notice, with each party to pay their own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this case accordingly. By Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/11/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Thu 10/10 6:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff Mary Lee Taylor (Guesno, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order Fri 09/20 11:31 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 20 September 2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/12/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document
Friday, August 30, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 08/30 11:38 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cynthia Jeannet Sanchez on behalf of Mary Lee TaylorAttorney Cynthia Jeannet Sanchez added to party Mary Lee Taylor(pty:pla) (Sanchez, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 08/30 3:17 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at their discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Standing Order and Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/30/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Issued Fri 08/30 8:58 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (agryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thursday, August 29, 2024
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 08/30 8:54 AM
Case assigned to Judge S. Kato Crews and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/29 5:36 PM
COMPLAINT against BAE Systems Space & Missions Systems, Inc., Ball Aerospace & Technologies Corp., Lisa Becker (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9849902)Attorney Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison added to party Mary Lee Taylor(pty:pla), filed by Mary Lee Taylor.(Harrison, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons