California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:24-cv-07402
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 12:28 AM PST
Defendant
Aperture Media Partners LLC
Represented By
Matthew Shields
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan
contact info
Gary Edward Gans
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver And Hedges LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Convergent Media IV LLC
Represented By
Joseph M. Wahl
Barnes And Thornburg LLP
contact info
Paul Joseph Laurin
Barnes And Thornburg LLP
contact info
Jonathan Boustani
Barnes And Thornburg LLP
contact info
Shant Nahabed Nashalian
Barnes And Thornburg LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
42 42 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 04/28 10:39 AM
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT APERTURE MEDIA PARTNERS LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT36 Motion Hearing held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Courtroom Deputy Clerk issues the Court's tentative ruling, prior to the hearing. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Counsel for Plaintiff: Paul J. Laurin. Counsel for Defendants: Gary E. Gans, Matthew Shields. Courtroom Deputy: Rita Sanchez. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. Time in court: 15. (rs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
41 41 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 04/14 10:50 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 36 filed by Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC. (Gans, Gary)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 04/14 10:47 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 36(Gans, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
39 39 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/31 4:39 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 36 filed by Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC. (Wahl, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
38 38 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/21 10:09 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS37 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The hearing on Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC's First Amended Complaint is CONTINUED from April 14, 2025, to April 28, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. (iv)
Related: [-]
37 37 stip Continue Thu 03/20 11:07 AM
STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date and Associated Deadlines for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss from April 14, 2025 to April 28, 2025 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 36 filed by Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC.(Wahl, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration of Joseph M. Wahl re Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date and Associated Deadlines for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
36 36 motion Dismiss Case Wed 03/12 10:33 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/14/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Gans, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
35 35 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 03/10 2:53 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT34 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC's First Amended Complaint is extended to March 12, 2025. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
34 34 stip Extension of Time to File Document Thu 03/06 2:30 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Aperture Media Partners LLC.(Gans, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Gary E. Gans,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, February 14, 2025
33 33 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 02/14 6:01 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC(Wahl, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Thursday, January 23, 2025
32 32 order Dismiss Case Appoint Receiver Fri 01/24 3:58 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS16 AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER23 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED without leave to amend as to Plaintiff's claim for breach of fiduciary duties. The Motion is GRANTED with leave to amend as to Plaintiff's claim for breach of contract. Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint by no later than February 14, 2025. Defendant shall respond to the FAC, if filed, by no later than March 10, 2025. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
31 31 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 12/17 1:50 PM
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT APERTURE MEDIA PARTNERS LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT16 , PLAINTIFF CONVERGENT MEDIA IV LLCS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER23 hearing held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk issues the Court's tentative ruling, prior to the hearing. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Counsel for Plaintiff: Paul J. Laurin. Counsel for Defendant: Gary E. Gans, Matthew Shields. Courtroom Deputy: Rita Sanchez. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. Time in court: 15. (rs)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 12/17 10:25 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gary Edward Gans counsel for Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC. Adding Gary E. Gans as counsel of record for Aperture Media Partners LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Aperture Media Partners LLC. (Gans, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
29 29 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 12/12 1:39 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's motion and after conferring with counsel, the Motion to Dismiss Case16 and Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC's Motion for Appointment of a Receiver23 are continued to 12/17/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
28 28 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 12/02 11:33 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 filed by Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC. (Shields, Matthew)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 12/02 7:43 PM
REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appoint Receiver -- Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of a Receiver; Memorandum of Points and Authorities 23 filed by Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC. (Boustani, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
26 26 26 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/25 10:57 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 filed by Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC. (Boustani, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 11/25 9:16 PM
OBJECTION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appoint Receiver -- Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of a Receiver; Memorandum of Points and Authorities 23 filed by Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC. (Shields, Matthew)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/25 8:34 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appoint Receiver -- Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of a Receiver; Memorandum of Points and Authorities 23 filed by Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC.(Shields, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jared Underwood,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jared Underwood
Monday, November 18, 2024
23 23 motion Appoint Receiver Mon 11/18 2:59 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appoint Receiver -- Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of a Receiver; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Boustani, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jonathan J. Boustani,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Jonathan J. Boustani,
Att: 3 Declaration of Santosh Govindaraju,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Santosh Govindaraju,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Santosh Govindaraju,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Santosh Govindaraju,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Santosh Govindaraju,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Santosh Govindaraju,
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Santosh Govindaraju,
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Santosh Govindaraju,
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Santosh Govindaraju,
Att: 12 Proposed Order
Friday, November 08, 2024
22 22 misc Errata Fri 11/08 5:38 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC. correcting Request for Judicial Notice17 (Shields, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 11/06 9:38 AM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On its own motion, the Court STRIKES the Motion to Dismiss Case15 which was re-filed at Docket No.16 with a proposed Order. For future filings, see http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/e-filing/proposed-documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
20 20 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 11/05 11:47 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict; re name of party or parties. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G-123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 02, 2024
19 19 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Sat 11/02 8:41 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC, identifying Emigrant Aperture Holdings LLC, Surefire Management Holdings LLC, Emigrant Bank, Jared Underwood, Andrew Robinson. (Shields, Matthew)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc For Judicial Notice Sat 11/02 8:28 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 filed by Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC.(Shields, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Friday, November 01, 2024
17 17 misc For Judicial Notice Sat 11/02 12:00 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 filed by Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC. (Shields, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss Case Fri 11/01 11:57 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Shields, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 motion Dismiss Case Fri 11/01 11:17 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Shields, Matthew)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Appearance Fri 11/01 10:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Shields on behalf of Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC (Attorney Matthew Shields added to party Aperture Media Partners LLC(pty:dft))(Shields, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 09/30 1:14 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Aperture Media Partners LLC answer now due 11/1/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Aperture Media Partners LLC.(Attorney Gary Edward Gans added to party Aperture Media Partners LLC(pty:dft))(Gans, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
12 12 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Fri 09/06 1:35 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:24-cv-00129 MWF(BFMx). Case transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-07402 MWF(BFMx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
11 11 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/05 1:13 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Aperture Media Partners LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 09/04 2:44 PM
Standing Order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (lfa)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 09/04 2:17 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 09/04 2:16 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 09/04 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
6 6 notice Related Case(s) Thu 08/29 6:32 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC. Related Case(s): 2:24-cv-00129-MWF-BFM (Wahl, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/29 6:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC (Wahl, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 08/29 6:23 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC, identifying Convergent Media IV LLC - Plaintiff; and Aperture Media Partners LLC - Defendant. (Wahl, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Thu 08/29 6:20 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC. (Wahl, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 08/29 6:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC. (Wahl, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/29 5:51 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38125223 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Convergent Media IV LLC. (Attorney Joseph M. Wahl added to party Convergent Media IV LLC(pty:pla))(Wahl, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - ABL Agreement