District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Loren L Alikhan
Case #: 1:24-cv-02477
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Terminated:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 3:21 AM EST
Defendant
ROBERT J. CONRAD
Represented By
Erika Kirstie Oblea
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
JOHN G. ROBERTS
Represented By
Erika Kirstie Oblea
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
OMAR JOSE CALZADA
3305 Falcon Grove
San Antonio, TX 78247

GPO May 07 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 21. See Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 5/7/2025. (lclla3)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
44 44 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion for Sanctions Order on Motion for Injunction Order on Motion to Show Cause Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Order on Wed 05/07 1:25 PM
ORDER: For the reasons explained in the court's Memorandum Opinion43 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss21 is GRANTED, that Plaintiff's Motion to Challenge Defendants' Westfall Act Certification 28 is DENIED, and that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment22 ; Defendants' Motion to Stay26 ; Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 28 ; Plaintiff's Motion to Stay, to Refer the Case, and to Order the Appearance of the Chief Justice 31 ; Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions, for an Injunction, and for an Order to Show Cause40 ; and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement42 are DENIED as moot. This Order constitutes a final judgment of the court within the meaning of Rule 58(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the case. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 5/7/2025. (lclla3)
Related: [-]
43 43 11 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 05/07 1:23 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss21 . See Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 5/7/2025. (lclla3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
42 42 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/02 9:27 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Supplement by OMAR JOSE CALZADA.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, April 28, 2025
41 41 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/28 3:42 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to40 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for InjunctionMOTION for Order to Show Cause by ROBERT J. CONRAD, JOHN G. ROBERTS.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/28 4:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time41 , to which Plaintiff objects, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(A), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions, Motion for Injunction, and Motion for Order to Show Cause40 on or before May 30, 2025. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 4/28/2025. (lclla3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
40 40 motion Sanctions Injunction Motion For Order Fri 04/25 9:34 AM
MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION for Injunction, MOTION for Order by OMAR JOSE CALZADA.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 1,
Att: 2 Part 2
Thursday, March 20, 2025
order Order on Motion for Hearing Thu 03/20 12:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motions for a Hearing 3839 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are DENIED. The court will rule on the parties' pending motions21 22 26 28 31 in due course. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 3/20/2025. (lclla3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
39 39 motion Hearing Mon 03/17 3:05 PM
MOTION for Hearing re13 Notice (Other) by OMAR JOSE CALZADA.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
38 38 motion Hearing Wed 03/05 9:15 PM
MOTION for Hearing by OMAR JOSE CALZADA. (See docket entry37 to view document) (mg)
Related: [-]
37 37 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 03/05 9:14 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 Motion to Stay, Motion for Order filed by OMAR JOSE CALZADA. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
36 36 11 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 03/03 10:41 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re 31 Motion to Stay, Motion for Order filed by JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
35 35 respm Reply to opposition to motion Mon 03/03 10:40 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY to opposition to motion re21 Motion to Dismiss filed by JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD.(Oblea, Erika) Modified event title on 3/3/2025 (znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, February 24, 2025
34 34 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 02/26 11:29 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re 28 Motion to Strike filed by OMAR JOSE CALZADA. (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
33 33 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Thu 02/20 5:20 PM
RESPONSE re27 Response to Document filed by JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
32 32 11 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 02/20 5:18 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re 28 Motion to Strike filed by JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
31 31 motion Stay Motion For Order Thu 02/20 3:53 PM
MOTION to Stay, MOTION for Order by OMAR JOSE CALZADA. (See docket entry30 to view document). (mg)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Supplemental Memorandum Thu 02/20 3:51 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 24 Response to motion filed by OMAR JOSE CALZADA.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
29 29 order Fox/Neal Order Scheduling Order Tue 02/11 3:12 PM
FOX/NEAL ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss21 on or before February 24, 2025. Because Plaintiff filed an opposition before this Order was issued, Plaintiff may modify or supplement any arguments in the original opposition on or before February 24, 2025. If Plaintiff files a supplemental brief, Defendants may file a supplemental reply on or before March 3, 2025. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment22 is HELD IN ABEYANCE pending the court's resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 2/11/2025. (lclla3)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/11 3:34 PM
***Deadlines terminated & Set/Reset Deadlines: Deft's Supplemental Reply to Dispositive Motions if any, due by 3/3/2025. (mhp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
26 26 motion Stay Fri 02/07 4:57 PM
MOTION to Stay re22 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
25 25 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 02/07 4:53 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re21 Motion to Dismiss filed by JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 06, 2025
28 28 motion Strike Tue 02/11 8:15 AM
MOTION to Strike21 MOTION to Dismiss by OMAR JOSE CALZADA. (See docket entry27 to view document) (mg)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Tue 02/11 8:13 AM
RESPONSE re13 Notice (Other) filed by OMAR JOSE CALZADA. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
24 24 respm Response to motion Mon 02/03 3:25 PM
RESPONSE re21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by OMAR JOSE CALZADA. (See docket entry23 to view document). (mg)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Supplemental Memorandum Mon 02/03 3:23 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re22 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by OMAR JOSE CALZADA.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
22 22 motion Partial Summary Judgment Fri 01/31 1:37 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by OMAR JOSE CALZADA.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 1,
Att: 2 Part 2,
Att: 3 Part 3,
Att: 4 Part 4,
Att: 5 Part 5
Friday, January 17, 2025
21 21 motion Dismiss Fri 01/17 3:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 02, 2025
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel Order on Motion to Stay Thu 01/02 3:23 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Counsel15 and Plaintiff's Motion to Stay16 . See order for details. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 1/2/2025. (lclla3)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
19 19 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 12/27 10:50 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re15 Motion to Disqualify Counsel filed by OMAR JOSE CALZADA. (mg)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/23 11:01 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer14 and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint1 on or before January 17, 2025. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 12/23/2024. (lclla3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 12/23 11:05 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/17/2025. (mhp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
17 17 22 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 12/20 2:58 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re15 Motion to Disqualify Counsel,16 Motion to Stay filed by JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
18 18 respm Response to motion Mon 12/23 2:12 PM
RESPONSE re14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re3 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint filed by OMAR JOSE CALZADA. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
16 16 motion Stay Tue 12/17 1:06 PM
MOTION to Stay by OMAR JOSE CALZADA.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
15 15 motion Disqualify Counsel Thu 12/12 2:12 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by OMAR JOSE CALZADA. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/06 9:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re3 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint by JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/06 9:52 PM
NOTICE of Westfall Certification / Partial Substitution by JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Westfall Certification,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/06 9:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of ROBERT J. CONRAD(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 12/03 4:22 PM
ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion to Stay8 . Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint1 on or before January 3, 2025. See order for details. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 12/03/2024. (lclla3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 12/03 4:27 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/3/2025. (mhp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
10 10 respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 11/21 5:04 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re8 Motion to Stay filed by JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, November 14, 2024
9 9 respm Response to motion Tue 11/19 2:24 PM
RESPONSE re8 MOTION to Stay filed by OMAR JOSE CALZADA.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
8 8 motion Stay Tue 11/12 8:37 PM
MOTION to Stay by JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/12 8:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of JOHN G. ROBERTS, ROBERT J. CONRAD(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 26, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Tue 10/01 8:46 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT J. CONRAD served on 9/23/2024; JOHN G. ROBERTS served on 9/23/2024, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/23/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/23/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/22/2024.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
5 5 notice Pro Se Electronic Noticing Form Wed 09/18 2:27 PM
NEW Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by OMAR JOSE CALZADA (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
4 4 service Certificate of Service Thu 09/12 12:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OMAR JOSE CALZADA re3 Amended Complaint.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/12 12:07 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by OMAR JOSE CALZADA.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 1,
Att: 2 Part 2
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Thu 08/29 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by OMAR JOSE CALZADA. Case related to Case No. 5:12cr642, 23-50838 14-50295 22-50090 23-50363 (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/29 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number 208063) filed by OMAR JOSE CALZADA.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 1,
Att: 2 Part 2,
Att: 3 Part 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
service Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 08/29 1:42 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mg)
Related: [-]