Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Tiffany R Johnson
Case #: 1:24-cv-03852
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
CFI, Critical Financing Inc
Plaintiff
Che Fluellen
3376 Estes Dr
Atlanta, GA 30349


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
11 11 service Return of Service Executed Mon 03/03 11:26 AM
Return of Service Executed by Che Fluellen. CFI, Critical Financing Inc served on 2/18/2025, answer due 3/11/2025. (djs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
10 10 notice Certificate of Compliance Wed 02/19 12:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance re9 Order, by Che Fluellen (djs)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/07 8:24 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Che Fluellen re9 Order. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
9 9 27 pgs order Order Thu 02/06 10:26 AM
GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CIVIL CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE TIFFANY R. JOHNSON. Within seven (7) days of entry of this Order in your case, you are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the attached Certificate of Compliance. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
8 8 1 pgs service USM 285 Service Tue 01/14 8:32 AM
Package prepared (USM 285, Issued Summons, Complaint, and ServiceOrder) and forwarded to USM for service upon CFI, Critical Financing Inc. (djs)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 01/14 8:32 AM
Summons Issued as to CFI, Critical Financing Inc. (djs)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/06 11:01 AM
Case Reassigned to Honorable Tiffany R Johnson. Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:24-cv-03852-TRJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 01/06 11:02 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Che Fluellen re Case Assigned/Reassigned,. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
6 6 3 pgs service Request for Waiver of Service Mon 12/09 3:42 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service (2 Notices of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, 2 Waiver of Service of Summons forms, 1 copy of the Complaint, 1 copy of the Service Order, and 1 Self-Addressed Stamped Envelope) mailed to CFI, Critical Financing Inc on 12/9/2024. If waiver not returned by 1/13/2025, prepare personal service package. (jkb)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs utility Remark Mon 12/09 3:36 PM
USM 285 Form and Proposed Summons received for CFI, Critical Financing Inc (jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM 285
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Forms Sent Wed 11/20 12:21 PM
ORDER, the Court finds that dismissal pursuant to § 1915(e)(2) is not warranted at this juncture. The Clerk is directed to send Fluellen a USM 285 form and summons for Defendant. Fluellen is directed to complete and return to the Clerk of Court the USM 285 form and summons for Defendant within twenty days from the date this Order is docketed. Fluellen is warned that failure to comply in a timely manner could result in dismissal of this action. Upon receipt of the forms, the Clerk is directed to prepare a service-waiver package for Defendant. Forms sent to party: USM 285; Summons. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/20/2024. (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Forms Sent Wed 11/20 12:39 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Che Fluellen re4 Order, Forms Sent, Forms sent to party: USM 285; Summons. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
3 3 3 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/03 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Che Fluellen.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 2 pgs order Order ruling on IFP ~Util -Service of Process Shall Not Issue Tue 09/03 10:15 AM
ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis, that Service of Process shall not issue at present time. The Clerk is also DIRECTED to submit this file to the assigned District Judge for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 09/03/2024. (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 09/03 10:17 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Che Fluellen re2 Order ruling on IFP, Order that Service of Process shall not issue at present time. (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 09/03 10:20 AM
Submission of3 Complaint, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). (jkb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 08/29 8:45 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (for IFP only), to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 08/29 8:44 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Che Fluellen.(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet