California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-07276
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2025 12:27 AM PST
Defendant
Marquee Funding Group, Inc.
Represented By
Lewis Raymond Landau
Lewis Landau Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Joe R.J. Solovy
Represented By
Lewis Raymond Landau
Lewis Landau Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Troy Slome
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Andres Salsido
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kimberly Gill Rabinoff
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Platinum Loan Servicing, Inc.
Represented By
Lewis Raymond Landau
Lewis Landau Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Kathleen Myers
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Myers
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Myers
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vickie McCarty
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lewis Landau
Represented By
Lewis Raymond Landau
Lewis Landau Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Scot Fine
Represented By
Lewis Raymond Landau
Lewis Landau Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Dorothy Fasack
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Todd Cobin
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Steven Cobin
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Barbara Cobin
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Benning Management Group
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dolores Thompson
Represented By
Troy H Slome
Meylan Davitt Jain Arevian And Kim LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dale Sundby
Tucson, AZ 85750
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
S.B.S. Trust Deed Network
Terminated: 11/18/2024
Represented By
Lewis Raymond Landau
Lewis Landau Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Stefanie Sundby
Terminated: 11/18/2024
5963 N. Golden Eagle Drive
Tucson, AZ 85750


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 4:21 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
86 86 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 04/16 4:15 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION (ECF No.81 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion for Reconsideration re: Order on Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.81 ) and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion(s), noticed for hearing on April 28, 2025, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
85 85 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 04/14 2:48 PM
REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Ruling,,,,80 81 filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale)
Related: [-]