Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-20479
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 30, 2024 4:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Victor Maurice Lindsey (2)
Represented By
Federal Community Defender
contact info
David R. Cripps
contact info
Defendant
Kanye Lamont Woods (1)
Represented By
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Celeste Kinney
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Andrew Picek
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/30/2024 5:04 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti: Initial Appearance as to Victor Lindsey held on 8/21/2024. Detention Hearing set for 8/26/2024 at 01:00 PM. Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Fabian Renteria) (AUSA: Tim McDonald) (KBro) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of CJA Attorney Appointment: David R. Cripps has accepted the appointment to represent Victor Lindsey. (Carter, Michael) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti: Initial Appearance as to Kanye Woods held on 8/21/2024. Detention Hearing set for 8/26/2024 at 01:00 PM. Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Fabian Renteria) (AUSA: Tim McDonald) (KBro) [2:24-mj-30356-DUTY]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti as to Victor Lindsey (1). (DJen) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti as to Kanye Woods (1). (DJen) [2:24-mj-30356-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Victor Lindsey held on 8/21/2024 before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.9 MB) (DJen) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Kanye Woods held on 8/21/2024 before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.3 MB) (DJen) [2:24-mj-30356-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 8/21/2024 as to Victor Lindsey. (JHea) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Celeste Kinney appearing for Kanye Woods (Kinney, Celeste) [2:24-mj-30356-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Victor Lindsey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 8/21/2024 as to Kanye Woods. (JHea) [2:24-mj-30356-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Victor Lindsey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Kanye Woods. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30356-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Victor Lindsey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Kanye Woods. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30356-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Kanye Woods. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30356-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Detention Hearing Not Held as to Victor Lindsey. Detention Hearing set for 8/27/2024 01:00 PM (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: David Cripps) (AUSA: Dani Asher) (DAll) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Detention Hearing as to Kanye Woods held on 8/26/2024 Disposition: Defendant ordered detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Celeste Kinney) (AUSA: Dani Asher) (DAll) [2:24-mj-30356-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Kanye Woods: Preliminary Examination set for 9/9/2024 01:00 PM (DAll) [2:24-mj-30356-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 Public Audio File of Proceeding as to Victor Lindsey held on 8/26/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. AUDIO FILE SIZE (0.5 MB) (MCho) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Victor Lindsey Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 Public Audio File of Detention Hearing as to Kanye Woods held on 8/26/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. AUDIO FILE SIZE (19.7 MB) (MCho) [2:24-mj-30356-DUTY]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Kanye Lamont Woods Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Detention Hearing as to Victor Lindsey held on 8/27/2024 Disposition: Defendant released on bond. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: David Cripps) (AUSA: Dani Asher) (DAll) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Victor Lindsey: Preliminary Examination set for 9/11/2024 01:00 PM (DAll) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 Public Audio File of Detention Hearing as to Victor Lindsey held on 8/27/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. AUDIO FILE SIZE (23.5 MB) (MCho) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Victor Lindsey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
12 12 BOND as to Victor Lindsey in the amount of $10,000 unsecured entered. (NAhm) [2:24-mj-30357-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
13 13 INDICTMENT as to Kanye Lamont Woods (1) count(s) 1, 2, Victor Maurice Lindsey (2) count(s) 3. (JHea)
Related: [-]