Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00075
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 30, 2024 3:18 AM EDT
defendant
Adam Christopher Mancuso (1)
Represented By
Michael J. Manning
Manninglaw
contact info
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Theodore Joseph Greeley
U.S. Attorney (marquette)
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/30/2024 4:33 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
NON-DOCUMENT ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as counsel for defendant Adam Christopher Mancuso; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
Related: [-]
1 1 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Adam Christopher Mancuso [Access to this document is available to the Court and temporarily available to attorney(s) for USA, Adam Christopher Mancuso only], USPO Jackson, Jordan) Modified to remove access to counsel on 8/29/2024 (cam).
Related: [-]
2 2 MINUTES of FIRST APPEARANCE in Rule 5 proceedings for defendant Adam Christopher Mancuso held before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; appearance entered by Michael J. Manning for Adam Christopher Mancuso on behalf of defendant (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (cam)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER as to defendant Adam Christopher Mancuso re Rule 5(f); signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER requiring defendant Adam Christopher Mancuso to appear September 10, 2024 at 12:30 p.m. by Zoom in the District of Columbia where charges are pending; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
Related: [-]
5 5 BOND and ORDER setting conditions of release as to defendant Adam Christopher Mancuso (1) PR bond; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER TO CONTINUE - ends of justice continuance as to defendant Adam Christopher Mancuso; time is excluded from 8/28/2024 until 9/10/2024; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
Related: [-]