Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-01888
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 30, 2024 2:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia (1)
Represented By
Joseph D. Vasquez
Law Offices Of Joseph D. Vasquez
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Scott Wisniewski
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/30/2024 4:14 AM CDT
Friday, August 02, 2024
Arrest of Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia (em) [3:24-mj-03317-MAT]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: No Bond Set as to Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (em) [3:24-mj-03317-MAT]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia. (em) [3:24-mj-03317-MAT]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia. (em) [3:24-mj-03317-MAT]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Joseph D. Vasquez for Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia appointed. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (em) [3:24-mj-03317-MAT]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance as to Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia held on 8/5/2024 Interpreter: L. Quevedo (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia (Court Reporter ERO.) (em) [3:24-mj-03317-MAT]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia, ( Detention Hearing set for 8/8/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Miguel A. Torres; Preliminary Hearing set for 8/8/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (em) [3:24-mj-03317-MAT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Scott Wisniewski appearing for USA. . Attorney Scott Wisniewski added to party USA(pty:pla) (Wisniewski, Scott) [3:24-mj-03317-MAT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing by Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia (em) [3:24-mj-03317-MAT]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION: Detained Without Bond as to Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (em) [3:24-mj-03317-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (bot1)
Related: [-]
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Tiburcio Cabrera-Sarabia (bot2)
Related: [-]