Washington Western District Court
Judge:Jamal N Whitehead
Case #: 2:24-cv-01368
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024
Case in other court:Middle District of Louisiana, Baton Rouge, 3:23-cv-01620-BAJ-RLB
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2025 12:44 AM PST
Defendant
Airborne ECS LLC
Represented By
Chad S Pehrson
Kunzler Bean & Adamson PC
contact info
Mark P Walters
Lowe Graham Jones PLLC
contact info
Tyler Davis Trew
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
Plaintiff
International Mezzo Technologies Inc
Represented By
David Scotton
Carver Darden Koretzky Tessier Finn Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Emily Gummer
Carver Darden Koretzky Tessier Finn Blossman & Areaux
contact info
John D Denkenberger
Christensen O'Connor Johnson & Kindness
contact info
John E Whitaker
Christensen O'Connor Johnson & Kindness
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
55 55 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 05/15 11:56 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER re54 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jamal N Whitehead. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
54 54 motion Protective Order Wed 05/14 3:52 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff International Mezzo Technologies Inc. Noting Date 5/14/2025, (Whitaker, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Redlined Protective Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order