Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rossie D Alston, Jr
Referred: William B Porter
Case #: 1:24-cv-01525
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 4:24 AM EST
Defendant
VEC Imaging GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By
Joshua Alan Hartman
Merchant & Gould P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Varex Imaging Corporation
Represented By
Brent Phillip Ray
King & Spalding Llp (il-Na)
contact info
Abby Lynn Parsons
King & Spalding Llp (tx-Na)
contact info
Paul Jarrett Weeks
King & Spalding LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/12 1:33 PM
ORDER granting38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ellen Yeseul Min and Paul Jarrett Weeks terminated. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 3/12/2025. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
39 39 misc Waiver of Tue 03/11 2:39 PM
Waiver of re38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Plaintiffs Motion to Permit Paul Weeks and Ellen Yeseul Min to Withdraw as Counsel] [Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re 38 ] by Varex Imaging Corporation (Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/11 2:30 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Plaintiffs Motion to Permit Paul Weeks and Ellen Yeseul Min to Withdraw as Counsel] by Varex Imaging Corporation.(Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/07 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ian S. Hoffman on behalf of Varex Imaging Corporation (Hoffman, Ian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Fri 03/07 8:14 AM
ORDER granting35 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ellen Yeseul Min for Varex Imaging Corporation. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/26/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
35 35 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/11 4:52 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ellen Yeseul Min and Certification of Local Counsel Paul Weeks Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-10004070. by Varex Imaging Corporation. (Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
34 34 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Mon 02/10 2:00 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re32 MOTION for Leave to File [Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority] filed by VEC Imaging GmbH & Co. KG.(Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
33 33 misc Waiver of Wed 02/05 11:11 AM
Waiver of re30 Response in Opposition to Motion [Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument] by Varex Imaging Corporation (Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Leave to File Document Wed 02/05 11:02 AM
MOTION for Leave to File [Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority] by Varex Imaging Corporation.(Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A - February 3, 2025 Decision,
Att: 2 Ex. B - Dr. Bauers Declaration
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
31 31 misc Waiver of Tue 02/04 3:36 PM
Waiver of re29 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration [Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument] by Varex Imaging Corporation (Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/04 12:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re29 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration filed by VEC Imaging GmbH & Co. KG. (Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Tue 02/04 8:48 AM
Notice of Correction re29 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
29 29 motion Leave to File Document Mon 02/03 6:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration by Varex Imaging Corporation.(Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, January 30, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Thu 01/30 3:23 PM
ORDERED that the Motion (Dkt. 25) is GRANTED: and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 27) shall be maintained under seal until further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 01/30/2025. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
27 27 misc Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition Tue 01/28 7:16 PM
Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens and Counts I and III for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction . (Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 01/28 7:13 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens and Counts I and III for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by VEC Imaging GmbH & Co. KG.(Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Gertraud Bauer
25 25 motion Seal Tue 01/28 7:09 PM
Consent MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by VEC Imaging GmbH & Co. KG.(Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
24 24 notice Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) Tue 01/28 6:41 PM
Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by VEC Imaging GmbH & Co. KG (Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
23 23 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/22 11:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens and Counts I and III for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Wolrad Prinz zu Waldeck und Pyrmont filed by Varex Imaging Corporation. (Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
22 22 26 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Wed 01/22 11:26 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens and Counts I and III for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Varex Imaging Corporation.(Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Wed 01/22 12:01 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part15 Motion to Seal. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 01/22/2025. (see order for details) (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
20 20 misc Sealed Document Thu 01/16 4:26 PM
Sealed Document re17 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens and Counts I and III for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and exhibits thereto . (Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/16 4:01 PM
ORDERED that Defendant must file unredacted copes of Exhibits 1-4 and an unredacted Memorandum under seal by Tuesday, January 21, 2025, at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 01/16/2025. (dvanm) Modified to correct signer's name on 1/16/2025 (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
utility 1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/13 11:05 AM
Motion Hearing deadline terminated - Per RDA's chambers, motion set for 2/05/2025 will be decided on the papers; no oral argument will be heard (tarm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/10 11:32 AM
Set Deadline as to17 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens and Counts I and III for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr. (triv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
18 18 misc Notice of Hearing Date Wed 01/08 6:03 PM
Notice of Hearing Date February 5, 2025 re17 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens and Counts I and III for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Wed 01/08 6:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens and Counts I and III for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by VEC Imaging GmbH & Co. KG.(Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
16 16 notice Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) Wed 01/08 5:35 PM
Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by VEC Imaging GmbH & Co. KG (Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Seal Wed 01/08 5:31 PM
Consent MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits 1-4 to the Memorandum by VEC Imaging GmbH & Co. KG.(Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Wed 01/08 3:26 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Abby Lynn Parsons for Varex Imaging Corporation. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 1/8/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Wed 01/08 3:24 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Brent Phillip Ray for Varex Imaging Corporation. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 1/8/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 12/16 11:02 AM
ORDERED that the Motion11 is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that Defendant is granted leave to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 8, 2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 12/16/2024. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Fri 12/13 5:21 PM
MOTION for Extension (Unopposed) of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by VEC Imaging GmbH & Co. KG.(Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/13 5:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Alan Hartman on behalf of VEC Imaging GmbH & Co. KG (Hartman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Fri 09/13 2:17 PM
ORDERED that Exhibits C-G, J-M, and U and the redacted passages of the Complaint in paragraphs 30-31, 34, 36-38, 40-44, 69, and 77-79 containing excerpts or descriptions of such exhibits shall remain under seal at this time re4 Motion to Seal. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 9/13/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/03 8:05 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Abby Lynn Parsons and Certification of Local Counsel Paul Weeks Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9719172. by Varex Imaging Corporation. (Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/03 8:01 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brent Phillip Ray and Certification of Local Counsel Paul Weeks Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9719169. by Varex Imaging Corporation. (Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
6 6 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 08/30 2:22 AM
Memorandum in Support re4 MOTION to Seal filed by Varex Imaging Corporation. (Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) Fri 08/30 2:19 AM
Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Varex Imaging Corporation re4 MOTION to Seal (Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Seal Fri 08/30 2:16 AM
MOTION to Seal by Varex Imaging Corporation.(Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 misc Sealed Document Fri 08/30 1:39 AM
Sealed Document re1 Complaint,,,,,.(Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit C - 2021 PPT from VEC_Filed Under Seal,
Att: 2 Exhibit D - Robinson PIIA_Filed Under Seal,
Att: 3 Exhibit E - Kirkham PIIA_Filed Under Seal,
Att: 4 Exhibit F - Woodman PIIA_Filed Under Seal,
Att: 5 Exhibit G - IP Agreement_Filed Under Seal,
Att: 6 Exhibit J - JOA_Filed Under Seal,
Att: 7 Exhibit K - Letter Agreement_Filed Under Seal,
Att: 8 Exhibit L - Patent Process Agreement_Filed Under Seal,
Att: 9 Exhibit M - Jan. 16, 2023 Letter from CETTEEN_Filed Under Seal,
Att: 10 Exhibit U - July 30, 2024 Varex Letter response_Filed Under Seal
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/30 1:20 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Varex Imaging Corporation. (Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/30 1:09 AM
Complaint for Declaratory Judgments of Patent Inventorship and Ownership Related [+] ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9714092.), filed by Varex Imaging Corporation.(Weeks, Paul)
Related: [-] dacted Public Version
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Patent 4,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Patent 6,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - 2021 PPT from VEC - Filed Under Seal,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Robinson PIIA - Filed Under Seal,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Kirkham PIIA - Filed Under Seal,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Woodman PIIA - Filed Under Seal,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - IP Agreement - Filed Under Seal,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Robinson 2021 Assignment,
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Kirkham 2021 Assignment,
Att: 11 Exhibit J - JOA - Filed Under Seal,
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Letter Agreement - Filed Under Seal,
Att: 13 Exhibit L - Patent Process Agreement - Filed Under Seal,
Att: 14 Exhibit M - Jan. 16, 2023 Letter from CETTEEN - Filed Under Seal,
Att: 15 Exhibit N - Dec. 11, 2023 Letter from BakerTilly,
Att: 16 Exhibit O - Dec. 21, 2023 Letter from BakerTilly,
Att: 17 Exhibit P - Patent 4 Correction by Declaratio,
Att: 18 Exhibit Q - Patent 6 Correction by Declaration,
Att: 19 Exhibit R - Patent 4 Assignment Record,
Att: 20 Exhibit S - Patent 6 Assignment Record,
Att: 21 Exhibit T - July 9, 2024 Letter from Maiwald,
Att: 22 Exhibit U - July 30, 2024 Varex Letter response - Filed Under Seal
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 08/30 2:43 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (dvanm)
Related: [-]