Massachusetts District Court
Judge:F Dennis Saylor, IV
Case #: 1:24-cv-12243
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 3:59 AM EST
Defendant
City of Taunton
15 Summer Street
Taunton, MA 02780
Represented By
Douglas I. Louison
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Manuel Diego Soza
Louison, Costello, Condon, & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ali Jaafar
Represented By
Vincent J. DeMore, III
Henning Strategies
contact info
Defendant
Massachusetts State Police
470 Worcester Road
Framingham, MA 01702
Represented By
Keith Andrew Paquette
Ma Department Of State Police
contact info
Defendant
Jack Mawn
Colonel Mass State Police 470 Worcester Road
Framingham, MA 01702
Represented By
Keith Andrew Paquette
Ma Department Of State Police
contact info
Defendant
Sarah Ulianelli
Represented By
Douglas I. Louison
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Manuel Diego Soza
Louison, Costello, Condon, & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By
Keith Andrew Paquette
Ma Department Of State Police
contact info
Defendant
Massachusetts Executive Office of Public Safety and Security
Represented By
Keith Andrew Paquette
Ma Department Of State Police
contact info
Plaintiff
Kayla Gifford
Represented By
James Michael Caramanica
Law Office Of James M. Caramanica
contact info

GPO May 07 2025
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL DISMISSALFor the foregoing reasons, the motions to dismiss filed by defendants Trooper Ali Jaafar (ECF No. 16); the City of Taunton and Officer Sarah Ulianelli (ECF No. 12); and the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, the Massachusetts State Police, the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security, and Colonel Jack Mawn (ECF No. 27) are GRANTED. Count 1 is dismissed as to all defendants. Counts 2, 4, 5, and 6 are dismissed as to the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, the Massachusetts State Police, the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security, and Colonel Jack Mawn. Counts 3, 4, and 5 are dismissed as to the City of Taunton.So Ordered. (MAC)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
33 33 15 pgs order Memorandum & Order Wed 05/07 2:38 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL For the foregoing reasons, the motions to dismiss filed by defendants Trooper Ali Jaafar (ECF No. 16 ); the City of Taunton and Officer Sarah Ulianelli (ECF No. 12 ); and the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, the Massachusetts State Police, the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security, and Colonel Jack Mawn (ECF No. 27 ) are GRANTED. Count 1 is dismissed as to all defendants. Counts 2, 4, 5, and 6 are dismissed as to the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, the Massachusetts State Police, the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security, and Colonel Jack Mawn. Counts 3, 4, and 5 are dismissed as to the City of Taunton. So Ordered. (MAC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Brunelli on behalf of Massachusetts Executive Office of Public Safety and Security, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Massachusetts State Police, Jack Mawn (Brunelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
34 34 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/07 2:41 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Keith Andrew Paquette terminated. (MAC)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/05 1:05 PM
Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Massachusetts Executive Office of Public Safety and Security, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Massachusetts State Police, Jack Mawn.(Paquette, Keith)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/05 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Andrew Paquette on behalf of Massachusetts Executive Office of Public Safety and Security, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Massachusetts State Police, Jack Mawn (Paquette, Keith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
29 29 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/05 12:21 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim filed by Kayla Gifford. (Caramanica, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
28 28 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 10/31 9:53 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Massachusetts Executive Office of Public Safety and Security, Massachusetts State Police, Jack Mawn. (Paquette, Keith)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 10/31 9:47 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Massachusetts Executive Office of Public Safety and Security, Massachusetts State Police, Jack Mawn. (Paquette, Keith) Modified on 10/31/2024 : Memorandum removed, as it was correctly filed as a separate entry. Please see entry28 .(de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/31 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Andrew Paquette on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Massachusetts Executive Office of Public Safety and Security, Massachusetts State Police, Jack Mawn (Paquette, Keith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
25 25 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/29 2:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Kayla Gifford. (Caramanica, James)
Related: [-]
24 24 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/29 1:47 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re16 First MOTION to Dismiss (As to Count I) filed by Kayla Gifford. (Caramanica, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
23 23 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Tue 10/22 1:38 PM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Ali Jaafar . (DeMore, Vincent)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/22 1:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ali Jaafar.(DeMore, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 10/11 2:49 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot19 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/31/24 to File Response/Reply as to16 First MOTION to Dismiss (As to Count I) (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 10/11 2:48 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/31/24 to File Response/Reply as to16 First MOTION to Dismiss (As to Count I) (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 10/10 12:48 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/31/24 to File Response/Reply as to16 First MOTION to Dismiss (As to Count I) by Kayla Gifford.(Caramanica, James)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 10/10 12:41 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/31/24 to File Response/Reply as to16 First MOTION to Dismiss (As to Count I) by Kayla Gifford.(Caramanica, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
17 17 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 10/07 5:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re16 First MOTION to Dismiss (As to Count I) filed by Ali Jaafar. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss Mon 10/07 2:21 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss (As to Count I) by Ali Jaafar (DeMore, Vincent) Modified on 10/7/2024: Removed memorandum in support of motion and properly refiled as a separate entry. Please see entry 17 . (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/04 2:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Taunton, Sarah Ulianelli.(Soza, Manuel)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1 Fri 10/04 2:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re12 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by Manuel Diego Soza on behalf of City of Taunton, Sarah Ulianelli. (Soza, Manuel)
Related: [-]
13 13 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 10/04 2:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by City of Taunton, Sarah Ulianelli. (Soza, Manuel)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss Fri 10/04 2:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by City of Taunton, Sarah Ulianelli.(Soza, Manuel)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/04 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Diego Soza on behalf of City of Taunton, Sarah Ulianelli (Soza, Manuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/03 1:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Sarah Ulianelli served on 9/13/2024, answer due 10/4/2024. (Caramanica, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/03 1:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed City of Taunton served on 9/16/2024, answer due 10/7/2024. (Caramanica, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/23 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent J. DeMore, III on behalf of Ali Jaafar (DeMore, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/20 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas I. Louison on behalf of City of Taunton, Sarah Ulianelli (Louison, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 09/19 6:04 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kayla Gifford. Commonwealth of Massachusetts waiver sent on 9/12/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (Caramanica, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 09/19 6:01 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kayla Gifford. Massachusetts Executive Office of Public Safety and Security waiver sent on 9/12/2024, answer due 11/12/2024; Massachusetts State Police waiver sent on 9/12/2024, answer due 11/12/2024; Jack Mawn waiver sent on 9/12/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (Caramanica, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 09/19 5:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kayla Gifford. Ali Jaafar waiver sent on 9/18/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. (Caramanica, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/30 5:19 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 08/30 1:31 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/30 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10577420 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kayla Gifford.(Caramanica, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form