Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Case #: 5:24-cv-00122
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 2:49 AM CST
Defendant
Lenovo Group Limited
Represented By
Christina Ji-Hye Yang
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett And Dunner LLP
contact info
Yinan Liu
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, Llp-Boston
contact info
Daniel M Jordan
Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner, LLP
contact info
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Daniel Cooley
Finnegan LLP
contact info
Jacob A Schroeder
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner LLP
contact info
Alexander Harding
Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner Llp-Dc
contact info
Jeffrey S Seddon, II
Desmarais Llp - New York
contact info
Plaintiff
GENERAL VIDEO, LLC
8 THE GREEN, SUITE B
DOVER, DE 19901
Represented By
Peter J McAndrews
Mcandrews, Held & Malloy, Ltd.
contact info
Matthew George McAndrews
Mcandrews, Held & Malloy, Ltd.
contact info
Kelly B Tidwell
Patton Tidwell & Culbertson
contact info
Geoffrey Patton Culbertson
Patton Tidwell & Culbertson, Llp - Texarkana
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
67 67 notice Notice of Compliance Wed 04/30 9:24 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by GENERAL VIDEO, LLC with P. R. 3-1 and P. R. 3-2 as to ASUSTeK Computer Inc. (McAndrews, Matthew)
Related: [-]
66 66 notice Notice of Compliance Wed 04/30 9:22 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by GENERAL VIDEO, LLC with P. R. 3-1 and P. R. 3-2 as to Acer Inc. (McAndrews, Matthew)
Related: [-]
65 65 notice Notice of Compliance Wed 04/30 9:19 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by GENERAL VIDEO, LLC with P. R. 3-1 and P. R. 3-2 as to HP Inc. (McAndrews, Matthew)
Related: [-]
64 64 notice Notice of Compliance Wed 04/30 9:17 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by GENERAL VIDEO, LLC with P. R. 3-1 and P.R 3-2 as to Lenovo Group Limited (McAndrews, Matthew)
Related: [-]
63 63 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/30 1:36 PM
JOINT NOTICE Regarding Mediation (General Video, LLC and ASUSTeK Computer Inc.) by GENERAL VIDEO, LLC, GENERAL VIDEO, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew)
Related: [-]
62 62 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/30 8:46 AM
JOINT NOTICE Regarding Mediation (General Video, LLC and Lenovo Group Limited) by GENERAL VIDEO, LLC, GENERAL VIDEO, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
61 61 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 5:41 PM
JOINT NOTICE Regarding Mediation (General Video, Inc. and HP Inc.) by GENERAL VIDEO, LLC, GENERAL VIDEO, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew)
Related: [-]
60 60 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 5:04 PM
JOINT NOTICE Regarding Mediation (General Video, LLC and Acer Inc.) by GENERAL VIDEO, LLC, GENERAL VIDEO, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew)
Related: [-]