New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:24-cv-08869
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 4:06 AM EST
Defendant
GETINGE USA SALES LLC
Represented By
VINCENT N. AVALLONE
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
CHRISTOPHER MANLEY
Kl Gates LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NURUDDIN MANJI
Represented By
KATHERINE CHARBONNIER OELTJEN
Console Mattiacci Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
13 13 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/15 2:31 PM
TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the July 14, 2025 status conference is adjourned to July 17, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. No later than July 10, 2025, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 5/15/2025. (akw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
12 12 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Tue 02/18 1:50 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 2/18/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
11 11 misc Proposed Order Fri 02/14 11:10 AM
Proposed Order Confidentiality Order (Appendix S) by GETINGE USA SALES LLC. (MANLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
10 10 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/07 10:55 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 2/6/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/07 9:40 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will enter a Pretrial Scheduling Order setting forth discovery deadlines. A status conference is scheduled for July 14, 2025, at 2:30 p.m. For the conference, please dial 973-437-5535 and enter Phone conference ID: 670 869 82#. No later than July 7, 2025, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case. To the extent the parties wish to raise a discovery dispute before the deadline set forth in the operative scheduling order, they shall do so consistent with the Court's[LINK:Case Management Order] . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 2/6/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 02/07 9:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. An initial scheduling conference was held on February 6, 2025. The Court will enter a Pretrial Scheduling Order setting forth discovery deadlines. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
8 8 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 01/30 12:33 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by GETINGE USA SALES LLC.(MANLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
7 7 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 01/06 10:39 AM
LETTER ORDER Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.1. On 2/6/2025 at 3:30 PM there shall be an Initial Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. The conference will be held telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 1/6/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER MANLEY on behalf of GETINGE USA SALES LLC (MANLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 11/01 12:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GETINGE USA SALES LLC identifying Getinge AB as Corporate Parent.. (AVALLONE, VINCENT)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/01 12:46 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by GETINGE USA SALES LLC.(AVALLONE, VINCENT)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/06 2:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NURUDDIN MANJI. GETINGE USA SALES LLC waiver sent on 9/4/2024, answer due 11/4/2024. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/03 11:07 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to GETINGE USA SALES LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/30 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT against GETINGE USA SALES LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15627924) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NURUDDIN MANJI.(OELTJEN, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 08/30 12:28 PM
Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte added. (ps)
Related: [-]