Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:24-cv-01527
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024
Terminated:Apr 21, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court for the County of Fairfax, Virginia, 22-017192
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 4:25 AM EST
Defendant
Anil Dhondi
26121 Wendell Street
Chantilly, VA 20152
Represented By
Jeremy S. Williams
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Adolyn Clark Wyatt
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Netlogic Solutions, Inc.
4229 Lafayette Center Drive, Suite 1175
Chantilly, VA 20151
Represented By
Robert H. Cox
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
11 11 order So Ordered Mon 04/21 12:09 PM
So Ordered re10 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Anil Dhondi. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 4/21/2025. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/16 3:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Anil Dhondi. (Wyatt, Adolyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 04/08 9:28 AM
Reset Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. (PER PTG CHAMBERS) (pmil, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 04/08 4:32 PM
Reset Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/30/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. (PER PTG CHAMBERS) (pmil, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
9 9 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 02/19 10:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/19/2025. Counsel for Plaintiff and Counsel for Defendant enter their appearance. Parties advise the Court of case status and counsel for Defendant asks that another status conference be set to allow the parties to continue with current mediation and settlement discussions. Status Conference set for 4/23/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. Court Reporter: S. Wallace (pmil, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 02/14 11:27 AM
Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2025 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. Status Conference set for 2/19/2025 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. (PER PTG CHAMBERS) (pmil, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
8 8 notice Notice (other) Tue 02/11 12:44 PM
NOTICE by Netlogic Solutions, Inc. of Change of Address (Cox, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 12/18 3:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles: Status Conference held (via teleconference) on 12/18/2024. Parties advise the Court of case status. Parties ask for a 30 to 60 day continuance of abeyance as the parties are in hopes that matters will be resolved by the end of January - GRANTED. Abeyance continued. A Status Conference to be scheduled in 60 days. Status Conference set for 2/19/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. Court Reporter: S. Wallace (pmil, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 12/17 12:18 PM
Reset Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/18/2024 at 10:45 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. (pmil, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 10/21 5:01 PM
It is hereby ORDERED that the Consent Motion is GRANTED. The Court will hold these proceedings in abeyance; and it is further ORDERED that the Parties will meet for a telephonic status conference before the Court on Wednesday, December 18, 2024, to update the Court as to the status of the mediation; and it is further ORDERED that the Parties shall provide dial-in information to the Court by noon on Tuesday December 17, 2024 re4 Consent Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 10/21/2024. (nneb)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Waiver of Mon 10/21 1:03 PM
Waiver of re4 Consent MOTION to Stay Consent Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by Anil Dhondi (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Stay Mon 10/21 1:02 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Consent Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance by Anil Dhondi. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 10/22 8:50 AM
Status Conference set for 12/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Remote- Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. (nneb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/11 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H. Cox on behalf of Netlogic Solutions, Inc. (Cox, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/11 12:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. Discovery due by 2/14/2025. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 10/11/24.(pmil, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice,
Att: 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Friday, August 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 08/30 12:43 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9715081.), filed by Anil Dhondi.(Wyatt, Adolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1 of 8,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2 of 8,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 3 of 8,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 4 of 8,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 5 of 8,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 6 of 8,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 7 of 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 8 of 8
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 08/30 3:24 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (dvanm)
Related: [-]