Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:J P Stadtmueller
Case #: 2:24-cv-01107
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 3:27 AM CST
Defendant
Jordan Bryant
Represented By
Justin J Dreikosen
City Of Milwaukee City Attorneys Office
contact info
Jennifer L Williams
Milwaukee City Attorneys Office
contact info
Naomi E Sanders
City Of Milwaukee - Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Oscar Espita
Represented By
Justin J Dreikosen
City Of Milwaukee City Attorneys Office
contact info
Naomi E Sanders
City Of Milwaukee - Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Nicolas Romeo
Represented By
Justin J Dreikosen
City Of Milwaukee City Attorneys Office
contact info
Naomi E Sanders
City Of Milwaukee - Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Alondra Santiago
Represented By
Justin J Dreikosen
City Of Milwaukee City Attorneys Office
contact info
Naomi E Sanders
City Of Milwaukee - Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Defendant
City of Milwaukee
Represented By
Justin J Dreikosen
City Of Milwaukee City Attorneys Office
contact info
Naomi E Sanders
City Of Milwaukee - Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Nominal Defendant
Compcare Health Services Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Torrey D Hardy
Represented By
Todd R Korb
Hupy And Abraham Sc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Nominal Defendant
State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Terminated: 12/03/2024
Represented By
Allison M Welch
State Of Wisconsin Department Of Health Services
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 23, 2025
27 27 misc Proposed Document Fri 05/23 10:47 AM
PROPOSED Order for Dismissal filed by Torrey D Hardy. (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/23 10:45 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Torrey D Hardy. (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Thu 03/20 8:21 AM
LETTER from Attorney Todd Korb Case Settled . (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Text Only Order Thu 03/20 11:00 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/20/2025. In light of the settlement of this matter25 , the Court will terminate the pending deadlines set forth in its17 abbreviated scheduling order and will order the Clerk of Court to administratively close this action pending the filing of appropriate dismissal paperwork. The parties shall file appropriate dismissal paperwork on or before May 30, 2025. (cc: all counsel) (gap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/06 6:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J Dreikosen on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Justin Dreikosen (Dreikosen, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
23 23 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 01/16 9:46 AM
DISREGARD; RULE 5 NOTICE DISCLOSURE Statement by Torrey D Hardy. (Korb, Todd) (Main Document 23 replaced on 1/16/2025) (mew). Modified on 1/16/2025 (mew)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Thu 01/16 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re23 Disclosure Statement filed by Torrey D Hardy. Certain discovery documents should not be filed. Please see Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d) for further information. The document has been replaced with a copy of Rule 5. Discovery documents should be served on opposing counsel in paper format. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (mew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Withdrawal by Attorney Fri 01/03 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal by Naomi E Sanders on behalf of City of Milwaukee, Alondra Santiago, Oscar Espita, Nicolas Romeo, Jordan Bryant.Attorney Jennifer L. Williams to be termed. (Sanders, Naomi)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/03 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Naomi E Sanders on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Naomi E. Sanders (Sanders, Naomi)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Attorney - Notice Parties Fri 01/03 4:22 PM
Attorney Jennifer L Williams terminated per22 Notice of Withdrawal. (mew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Party Tue 12/03 12:11 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/3/2024. IT IS ORDERED that Nominal Defendant the State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services' motion to be dismissed as a party from this action, ECF No.19 , be and the same is hereby GRANTED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any subrogation lien that Nominal Defendant the State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services may have asserted under Wis. Stat. § 49.89(2) is released and discharged, without costs to any party. (cc: all counsel)(rcm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Mon 10/28 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re19 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services ; Certain attachments to this document should have been filed as separate entries - Declarations and Affidavits should be filed as stand-alone events. This document does not need to be re-filed ; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (rcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
19 19 motion Dismiss Party Fri 10/25 11:13 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Party by State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services.(Welch, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss DHS,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service DHS Certificate of Service
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Wed 10/23 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re18 Disclosure Statement filed by Torrey D Hardy ; Certain discovery documents should not be filed. Please see Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d) for further information. The document has been replaced with a copy of Rule 5. Discovery documents should be served on opposing counsel in paper format; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (rcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
18 18 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 10/22 10:04 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Torrey D Hardy. (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/15 9:22 AM
ABBREVIATED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/15/2024. Interim Settlement Report due by 4/25/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2025. (cc: all counsel) (gap)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
16 16 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Fri 10/11 9:55 AM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Defendants. (Williams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
15 15 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/30 11:07 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Oscar Espita, Alondra Santiago. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Williams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/27 8:45 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Jordan Bryant, City of Milwaukee, Oscar Espita, Nicolas Romeo, Alondra Santiago.(Williams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/25 11:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Torrey D Hardy. Oscar Espita served on 9/12/2024. (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Wed 09/25 11:44 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Torrey D Hardy as to Oscar Espita. (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/25 11:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Torrey D Hardy. Alondra Santiago served on 9/12/2024. (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Wed 09/25 11:42 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Torrey D Hardy as to Alondra Santiago. (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
9 9 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/20 6:26 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jordan Bryant, City of Milwaukee, Nicolas Romeo. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Williams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/20 6:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Williams on behalf of Jordan Bryant, City of Milwaukee, Nicolas Romeo. Attorney(s) appearing: Jennifer Williams (Williams, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/19 9:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Torrey D Hardy. Nicolas Romeo served on 9/9/2024. (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/19 9:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Torrey D Hardy. Jordan Bryant served on 9/9/2024. (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/19 9:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Torrey D Hardy. City of Milwaukee served on 9/6/2024. (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/12 12:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Torrey D Hardy. State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services served on 9/6/2024. (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/12 12:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Torrey D Hardy. Compcare Health Services Insurance Company served on 9/6/2024. (Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
2 2 order Pretrial Order Tue 09/03 9:20 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 9/3/2024. Judge Stadtmueller has adopted revised pretrial procedures for civil cases. Counsel for all parties should carefully review this Order and may contact chambers if they have any questions about the matters addressed herein. (cc: all counsel) (gap)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 09/03 11:15 AM
Summons Issued as to Jordan Bryant, City of Milwaukee, Compcare Health Services Insurance Company, Oscar Espita, Nicolas Romeo, Alondra Santiago, State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (rcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/30 12:48 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Torrey D Hardy. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4759405)(Korb, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons - Alondra Santiago,
Att: 3 Summons Summons - City of Milwaukee,
Att: 4 Summons Summons - Compcare Health,
Att: 5 Summons Summons - Jordan Bryant,
Att: 6 Summons Summons - Oscar Espita,
Att: 7 Summons Summons - Nicholas Romeo,
Att: 8 Summons Summons - State of Wisconsin Department of Health
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 08/30 12:52 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
Related: [-]