North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Catherine C Eagles
Referred: L Patrick Auld
Case #: 1:24-cv-00738
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 4:01 AM EST
Defendant
GODIRECTINC.COM, INC.
Represented By
JOSHUA D. MARTIN
Johnson & Martin, P. A.
contact info
ANDREW T OLIVER
Amin, Turocy & Watson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC
Represented By
MASON P. BUTNER
Tuggle Duggins, P.A.
contact info
JEFFREY S. SOUTHERLAND
Tuggle Duggins P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing Fri 05/09 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 6/30/2025 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (kg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
26 26 misc Reply - non motion Thu 05/08 3:04 PM
REPLY by Counter Defendant CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC to24 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim . (BUTNER, MASON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/17 2:27 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to24 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC.(BUTNER, MASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/17 2:53 PM
TEXT ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time by CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC. Answer to counterclaims due 5/8/2025. At the direction of the Court, it is FURTHER ORDERED that, before filing any motion to dismiss, plaintiff's counsel shall initiate a meet-and-confer with defendant's counsel about the basis of any such anticipated motion and whether disputed issues can be resolved or narrowed by an amended pleading and SHALL file a statement of compliance with this order with any motion to dismiss. Signed by Lawrence H. Cunningham, Clerk of Court, 4/17/2025. (lhc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/17 3:00 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC answer to counterclaim due 5/8/2025. (lhc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 03/27 4:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against by GODIRECTINC.COM, INC.. (OLIVER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
23 23 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 03/13 2:07 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT signed by Chief/Senior District Judge CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 3/13/25, that 1. GoDirect's motion to set aside entry of default, Doc.15 , is GRANTED and entry of default, Doc.11 , is SET ASIDE. 2. Camco's motion for default judgment, Doc.17 , is DENIED. 3. GoDirect SHALL file answer or other responsive pleading within fourteen calendar days. If defendant files a motion to dismiss for insufficient service of process or other defense related to service or otherwise raises such matters in the answer, the Court will reconsider all aspects of this Order. (cb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
utility Motions Submitted Mon 03/10 9:03 AM
Motions Submitted:15 MOTION to Set Aside Default and17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to (And for Permanent Injunction) to Chief/Senior District Judge CATHERINE C. EAGLES- (rw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/07 3:31 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC, to Response to17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to (And for Permanent Injunction) filed by CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC. (BUTNER, MASON)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/28 6:24 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant GODIRECTINC.COM, INC., to Response to15 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by GODIRECTINC.COM, INC.. (OLIVER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/21 10:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to (And for Permanent Injunction) filed by CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC filed by GODIRECTINC.COM, INC.. Replies due by 3/7/2025(OLIVER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Warren Liu - Supplemental,
Att: 2 Affidavit Leo Leong,
Att: 3 Affidavit Jacob Ramirez
Friday, February 14, 2025
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/14 3:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by GODIRECTINC.COM, INC. filed by CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC. Replies due by 2/28/2025(BUTNER, MASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mason P. Butner
Friday, January 31, 2025
18 18 respm Brief Fri 01/31 1:31 PM
BRIEF re17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to (And for Permanent Injunction) by Plaintiff CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC filed by CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC. (BUTNER, MASON)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Default Judgment Fri 01/31 1:29 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to (And for Permanent Injunction) by CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2025(BUTNER, MASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Andrew Angel,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jeffrey Southerland,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Judgment and Permanent Injunction
Thursday, January 30, 2025
16 16 21 pgs respm Memorandum Thu 01/30 5:43 PM
MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant GODIRECTINC.COM, INC. re15 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by GODIRECTINC.COM, INC.. (OLIVER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
15 15 motion Set Aside Default Wed 01/29 7:45 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default by GODIRECTINC.COM, INC.. Response to Motion due by 2/19/2025(OLIVER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Warren Liu,
Att: 4 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew T. Oliver
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Special Appearance Tue 01/21 6:18 PM
NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ANDREW T OLIVER on behalf of Defendant GODIRECTINC.COM, INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-4001437.) (OLIVER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 01/21 6:00 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JOSHUA D. MARTIN on behalf of Defendant GODIRECTINC.COM, INC. (MARTIN, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
utility Case Referred to Judge Fri 01/03 10:16 AM
CASE REFERRED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (rw)
Related: [-]
order Order Fri 01/03 10:32 AM
TEXT ORDER issued by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 1/3/25. Since obtaining an entry of default on October 15, 2024, and despite inquiry from the Clerks office, the plaintiff has done nothing to prosecute this case. No later than January 31, 2025, the plaintiff SHALL take appropriate steps to move this case to a conclusion, by filing a motion for default judgment or summary judgment, asking for a trial date, or otherwise proposing a way forward. In the absence of some action, the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to prosecute, without further notice, pursuant to FedRCivP 41(b).(rw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
12 12 service Certificate of Service Tue 10/15 4:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC re11 Order on Motion for Entry of Default (BUTNER, MASON)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Tue 10/15 8:09 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT signed by John S. Brubaker on 10/15/2024; against Defendant GODIRECTINC.COM, INC. in this action as provided by Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
10 10 motion Entry of Default Fri 10/11 4:04 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC.(BUTNER, MASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mason P. Butner,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 10, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Thu 10/10 1:28 PM
Letter from Clerk of Court to counsel for plaintiff regarding no answer filed by defendant, which was due 9/30/24. (rw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/09 12:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent YELLOWSTONE BUYER ACQUISITION LLC, Corporate Parent YELLOWSTONE MIDCO LLC, Other Affiliate US TECHNOLOGY MANUFACTURING CO. LTD., Other Affiliate SUN RAY INDUSTRIES CO. LTD., Other Affiliate NINGBO HEALTHY EAST IMPORT & EXPORT CO., Other Affiliate HEALTH EAST PLASTIC & METAL PRODUCTS CO. LTD., Other Affiliate CHANGING DEKAI VEHICLE ACCESSORIES CO. LTD. for CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC.. (SOUTHERLAND, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order Tue 09/17 1:40 PM
STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (rw)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 09/17 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MASON P. BUTNER on behalf of Plaintiff CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC (BUTNER, MASON)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/16 4:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to GODIRECTINC.COM, INC. served on 9/9/2024, answer due 9/30/2024. (SOUTHERLAND, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
utility Case Referred to Mediation Tue 09/03 8:59 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (kag)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Right to Consent Fri 08/30 4:34 PM
Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (lg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/30 4:31 PM
Summons Issued as to GODIRECTINC.COM, INC. (lg)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/30 2:58 PM
COMPLAINT against GODIRECTINC.COM, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3905670.), filed by CAMCO MANUFACTURING, LLC.(SOUTHERLAND, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned Fri 08/30 4:20 PM
Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (lg)
Related: [-]