California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:24-cv-07420
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 12:45 AM PST
Defendant
Alvin Bragg
Represented By
Alexander Paul Sanyshyn
New York County District Attorneys Office
contact info
Jacqueline M. Studley
New York County District Attorney'S Office
contact info
Chen-Chen Cecelia Chang
New York County District Attorney'S Office
contact info
Todd C Toral
Jenner And Block LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron Mendelsohn
Represented By
Kerry K. Walsh
Arnold And Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Marcus A. Asner
Arnold And Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Kristina Iliopoulos
Arnold And Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Tal R. Machnes
Arnold And Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
49 49 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 10:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' STIPULATION ENLARGING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S EXPECTED MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY48 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: 1. Defendant shall file any motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or motion to stay discovery on or before May 30, 2025. If Defendant does not file a motion to dismiss on or before that date, Defendant shall file an answer to the Amended Complaint on or before May 30, 2025.2. Plaintiff shall file any briefs in opposition to Defendants motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or motion to stay discovery on or before July 11, 2025. 3. Defendant shall file any reply briefs in further support of Defendant's motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or motion to stay discovery on or before August 1, 2025. 4. Any hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint and/or motion to stay discovery shall be held on Monday, September 8, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. or such a date and time thereafter as may be convenient for the Court. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
48 48 stip Extension of Time to File Document Thu 04/24 1:24 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Stay Briefing filed by Defendant Alvin Bragg.(Studley, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 18, 2025
47 47 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 04/18 1:41 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff Alvin Bragg amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn(Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Friday, March 28, 2025
46 46 order For Order re Discovery Matter Dismiss Fri 03/28 2:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS26 AND DENYING DEFENDANTS EXPARTE APPLICATION TO STAY DISCOVERY43 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II : The Court GRANTS Defendant Alvin Bragg, in his official capacity as the District Attorney of New York County, New York ("DANY's") Motion to Dismiss. The case is DISMISSED without prejudice, and with leave to amend the jurisdictional allegations within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. If Mendelsohn fails to file a timely amended complaint, the Court will close this case. Finally, as the Court dismisses this action because Mendelsohn lacks Article III standing, the Court DENIES Defendants Ex Parte Application as moot. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
45 45 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 03/25 3:38 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 weeks, filed by Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn.. (Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
44 44 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/04 5:00 PM
OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Stay of Discovery 43 filed by Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn.(Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Marcus Asner
Monday, March 03, 2025
43 43 10 pgs motion Order re Discovery Matter Mon 03/03 5:34 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Stay of Discovery filed by defendant Alvin Bragg.(Sanyshyn, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
42 42 6 pgs order Order Tue 01/21 10:07 AM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SCHEDULING ORDER on April 1, 2025 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
41 41 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/11 1:39 PM
ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: granting39 Non-Resident Attorney Jacqueline M. Studley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Alvin Bragg, designating Todd C. Toral as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
40 40 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/11 12:24 PM
ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: granting38 Non-Resident Attorney changc@dany.nyc.gov APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Alvin Bragg, designating Todd C. Toral as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
39 39 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 12/10 12:22 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jacqueline M. Studley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Alvin Bragg (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38727878) filed by defendant Alvin Bragg. (Toral, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
38 38 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 12/10 12:12 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Chen-Chen Cecelia Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Alvin Bragg (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-38727744) filed by defendant Alvin Bragg. (Toral, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
37 37 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 12/10 8:18 AM
The hearing on the MOTION to Dismiss26 , scheduled for December 16, 2024 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
36 36 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 12/09 1:46 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 26 filed by Defendant Alvin Bragg. (Sanyshyn, Alexander)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 12/09 1:29 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Todd C Toral counsel for Defendant Alvin Bragg. Adding Todd C. Toral as counsel of record for Alvin Bragg for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alvin Bragg. (Attorney Todd C Toral added to party Alvin Bragg(pty:dft))(Toral, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
34 34 order Extension of Time to File Mon 12/02 8:49 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BRAGG'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DISMISS NO LATER THAN MONDAY DECEMBER 9, 202433 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 11/27 12:35 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by defendant Alvin Bragg. (Sanyshyn, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 25, 2024
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/25 3:48 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 26 filed by Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn.(Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Marcus Asner
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
31 31 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/05 1:19 PM
ORDER DENYING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jacqueline M. Studley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Alvin Bragg, DA of New York County. Reasons are not sufficient to obtain relief of the requirements set forth in L.R. 83-2.1.3.4.24 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) Tue 11/05 1:02 PM
ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from L.R. 83-2.1.3.4(2) 28 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely; Review local rule 6.1, 7-4, 7-3. (lc)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 11/05 12:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR Motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submitdocuments electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Relief Tue 11/05 9:58 AM
(STRICKEN PER 11/5/2024 ORDER DOCKET NO. 30). Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from L.R. 83-2.1.3.4(2) filed by defendant Alvin Bragg. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Sanyshyn, Alexander) Modified on 11/5/2024 (lc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
27 27 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) Tue 11/05 8:51 AM
ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from L.R. 83-2.1.3.4(2) 25 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely; Review local rule 6.1, 7-4, 7-3. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
26 26 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Mon 11/04 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Alvin Bragg. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Sanyshyn, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alexander P. Sanyshyn,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
25 25 motion Relief Mon 11/04 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from L.R. 83-2.1.3.4(2) filed by Defendant Alvin Bragg. (Sanyshyn, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 11/04 1:53 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jacqueline M. Studley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Alvin Bragg (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38520668) filed by defendant Alvin Bragg. (Sanyshyn, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
23 23 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 10/29 1:34 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G-123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Appearance Tue 10/29 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alexander Paul Sanyshyn on behalf of Defendant Alvin Bragg (Attorney Alexander Paul Sanyshyn added to party Alvin Bragg(pty:dft))(Sanyshyn, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
21 21 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 10/22 3:18 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Tue 10/22 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-07420-ODW (JPRx). (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
19 19 misc Statement Mon 10/21 11:01 AM
STATEMENT Of Consent To Proceed Before A United States Magistrate Judge re: Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form5 . (Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
18 18 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Fri 10/18 2:17 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
17 17 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/18 3:18 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting12 Non-Resident Attorney Kerry K. Walsh's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn, designating Kristina M. Iliopoulos as local counsel. (hr)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/18 3:16 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting11 Non-Resident Attorney Tal R. Machnes' APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn, designating Kristina M. Iliopoulos as local counsel. (hr)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/18 3:14 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting10 Non-Resident Attorney Marcus A. Asner's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn, designating Kristina M. Iliopoulos as local counsel. (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 09/16 10:16 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn. upon Alvin Bragg waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/3/2024, answer due 11/4/2024. Waiver of Service signed by 09/09/2024. (Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 09/12 10:33 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn, upon Defendant Alvin Bragg served on 9/6/2024, answer due 9/27/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alvin Bragg, in his official capacity as the District Attorney of the New York County, New York in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 09/04 1:45 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kerry K. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38149955) filed by Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn. (Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 09/04 1:42 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tal R. Machnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38149900) filed by Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn. (Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 09/04 1:37 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marcus A. Asner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38149765) filed by Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn. (Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
9 9 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 09/03 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kerry K. Walsh. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 09/03 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Tal R. Machnes. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 09/03 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Marcus A. Asner. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 09/03 3:04 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Alvin Bragg. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Tue 09/03 3:00 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Friday, August 30, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 08/30 2:28 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn. (Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 08/30 1:54 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn, identifying No Interested Parties. (Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 08/30 1:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn. (Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 08/30 1:35 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38130012 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff Aaron Mendelsohn. (Attorney Kristina Iliopoulos added to party Aaron Mendelsohn(pty:pla))(Iliopoulos, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2