Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Sara E Hill
Case #: 4:24-cv-00403
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 3:03 AM CST
Defendant
AG Equipment Company
Represented By
Christopher S Thrutchley
Gablegotwals
contact info
Robert Joseph Bartz
Barber & Bartz
contact info
Andrew Scroggins
Seyfarth Shaw
contact info
Christopher J. DeGroff
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Adrienne Nichole Cash
Barber & Bartz
contact info
Joe Martin Fears
Barber & Bartz
contact info
Samantha L Brooks
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Kevin Lewis
Represented By
Howard Berkson
Boston Avenue Law PLLC
contact info
Donald Jon Slaughter
Boston Avenue Law PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
William Materne
Represented By
Howard Berkson
Boston Avenue Law PLLC
contact info
Donald Jon Slaughter
Boston Avenue Law PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Barry McBride
Represented By
Howard Berkson
Boston Avenue Law PLLC
contact info
Donald Jon Slaughter
Boston Avenue Law PLLC
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Nicholas Smalley
Represented By
Howard Berkson
Boston Avenue Law PLLC
contact info
Donald Jon Slaughter
Boston Avenue Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By
Lauren Wilson
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Patrick JoHugh Holman
Us Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (okc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, March 14, 2025
52 52 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/14 12:28 PM
NOTICE Appearance of Stefanie R. Moll & Anna M. Robshaw by AG Equipment Company [Note: Attorney Stefanie Robin Moll added to party AG Equipment Company(pty:dft).] (Moll, Stefanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
51 51 order 01 - Order Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/12 9:20 AM
ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill - Stefanie R. Moll and Anna M. Robshaw are admitted pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant A G Equipment Company ; granting49 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting50 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
50 50 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/11 3:11 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Anna M. Robshaw to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $125 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3172503) by AG Equipment Company (With attachments) (Cash, Adrienne)
Related: [-]
49 49 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/11 3:05 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Stefanie R. Moll to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $125 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3172483) by AG Equipment Company (With attachments) (Cash, Adrienne)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
48 48 order 02 - Minute Order Attorney - Added/Terminated Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) Mon 03/10 3:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill - Seyfarth Shaw LLP's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant AG Equipment Co. [ECF No. 47] is granted. ; terminating attorney Andrew Scroggins; Samantha L Brooks and Christopher J. DeGroff ; granting47 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
Related: [-]
47 47 motion Withdraw Attorney(s) Mon 03/10 2:26 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT A G EQUIPMENT COMPANY by AG Equipment Company (With attachments) (DeGroff, Christopher)
Related: [-]