Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Pamela A Barker
Case #: 1:24-cv-01493
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 3:54 AM EST
Counter-Claimant
Winston Products LLC
Represented By
Carter S. Ostrowski
Tucker Ellis - Cleveland
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Uriah Products, LLC
Represented By
Yizhou Liu
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Kyle T. Deighan
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Todd R. Tucker
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Winston Products LLC
30339 Diamond Parkway Suite 105
Cleveland, OH 44139
Represented By
Carter S. Ostrowski
Tucker Ellis - Cleveland
contact info
Jay R. Campbell
Tucker Ellis - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Uriah Products, LLC
Represented By
Yizhou Liu
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Kyle T. Deighan
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Todd R. Tucker
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
20 20 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Mon 03/31 4:20 PM
Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Status Conference set for 6/2 4/2025 at 01:30 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Pamela A. Barker.The parties are to use the same call-in instructions as previously provided for accessing the conference call. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/31/2025. (P,K)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference Mon 03/31 3:12 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Pamela A. Barker. The Court conducted a Case Management Conference on March 31, 2025. Participating on behalf of Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Uriah Products, LLC were Attorneys Todd R. Tucker and Kyle T. Deighan. Participating on behalf of Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Winston Products LLC were Attorneys Jay R. Campbell and Carter S. Ostrowski. Separate Case Management Conference Order to issue. Time: 10 minutes. (P,K)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
19 19 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Mon 03/24 4:21 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Uriah Products, LLC. (Tucker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
18 18 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 02/24 12:33 PM
Attorney Appearance by Jay R. Campbell filed by on behalf of Winston Products LLC. (Campbell, Jay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
order Order on Motion to continue Tue 02/04 8:09 AM
Order [non-document] Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Case Management Conference (Doc. No.17 ) is granted as follows. The telephonic CMC currently set for February 19, 2025 is cancelled and reset for March 31, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. Parties shall use the previously provided dial in information. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 2/4/2025.(P,K)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
17 17 motion Continue Mon 02/03 1:28 PM
Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff Uriah Products, LLC, Counter-Defendant Uriah Products, LLC. (Tucker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
16 16 resp Reply Thu 01/23 10:29 PM
Reply in support of11 Motion to dismiss counterclaim 3, for failure to state a claim filed by Uriah Products, LLC. (Tucker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
15 15 resp Opposition Thu 01/16 4:55 PM
Opposition to11 Motion to dismiss counterclaim 3, for failure to state a claim filed by Winston Products LLC. (Ostrowski, Carter)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
14 14 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy Mon 01/06 9:46 AM
Magistrate Consent Package issued by Courtroom Deputy. (P,K)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Mon 01/06 9:46 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held telephonically on 2/19/2025 at 02:30 PM. The Court will provide counsel with call-in instructions, via email, for accessing the conference call. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 1/6/2025.(P,K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Patent
Friday, January 03, 2025
12 12 oth_ans Answer Fri 01/03 7:12 PM
Answer to Counterclaims filed by Uriah Products, LLC. (Tucker, Todd)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/03 7:09 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Counterclaim 3 filed by Plaintiff Uriah Products, LLC, Counter-Defendant Uriah Products, LLC.(Tucker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim 3
Friday, December 13, 2024
10 10 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Fri 12/13 3:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Winston Products LLC. (Ostrowski, Carter)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Fri 12/13 3:05 PM
Answer to7 Amended complaint , Counterclaim against Uriah Products, LLC filed by Winston Products LLC.(Ostrowski, Carter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Winston TowSmart Adj. Ball Mount Hitch - Tender of Claim
Monday, December 02, 2024
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Mon 12/02 12:31 PM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon Winston Products LLC on 11/26/2024, filed on behalf of Uriah Products, LLC (Tucker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/26 12:32 PM
Amended complaint against Winston Products LLC. Filed by Uriah Products, LLC. (Tucker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit US Patent No. 10857846
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
6 6 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 09/04 1:49 PM
Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Winston Products LLC. (P,G)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
5 5 oth_doc Praecipe Tue 09/03 4:05 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons filed by Uriah Products, LLC.(Tucker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
4 4 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 09/03 2:55 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Winston Products LLC. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 09/03 2:50 PM
Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 09/03 2:51 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Link to Local Patent Rules Tue 09/03 3:19 PM
This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to [LINK:Local Patent Rules] . (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
3 3 oth_doc Report Regarding Patent or Trademark Action - AO120 Fri 08/30 11:44 PM
Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Uriah Products, LLC. (Tucker, Todd)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Fri 08/30 11:42 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Forcome USA, Inc. for Uriah Products, LLC filed by Uriah Products, LLC. (Tucker, Todd)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/30 11:36 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Winston Products LLC. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12717132.. Filed by Uriah Products, LLC. (Tucker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - US10857846,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Summons