Virgin Islands District Court
Judge:Wilma A Lewis
Referred: G Alan Teague
Case #: 3:24-cv-00045
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024
Re-opened:Oct 15, 2024
Terminated:Oct 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 4:54 AM AST
Defendant
Generali Global Assistance, Inc.
Plaintiff
Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP
1000 Frederiksberg Gade
St. Thomas, VI 00802
Represented By
Craig M. O'Shea
Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP
contact info
Chad C. Messier
Dudley Topper & Feuerzeig
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, October 18, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 10/18 7:13 PM
ORDER (WAL) dated 10/18/2024. ACCEPTING Plaintiff's10 "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal"; DISMISSING the case WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ORDERING the Clerk of Court to mark this case CLOSED. (LJF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/15 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP (Messier, Chad)
Related: [-]
utility Civil Case Closed-Stipulation Tue 10/15 12:18 PM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 motion Entry of Default Wed 09/25 10:31 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP. (O'Shea, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Corporate Registration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
misc Notice of Corrected Docket Entry Wed 09/25 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re:9 MOTION for Entry of Default . A memorandum in support is required pursuant to LRCi 7.1(a). (TSJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/11 10:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP. (O'Shea, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/10 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad C. Messier on behalf of Plaintiff Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP (Messier, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service(Not to be used for Summons Returned) Fri 09/06 8:56 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Generali Global Assistance, Inc. on 9/3/24, filed by Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP. (O'Shea, Craig)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Corrected Docket Entry Fri 09/06 8:48 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re:5 Summons Returned Executed. PDF and Event do not match. Filer is advised to refile document under the correct event. (TSJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/05 11:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP. Generali Global Assistance, Inc. served on 9/3/2024, answer due 9/24/2024. (O'Shea, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
4 4 misc Notice to Parties of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to MagJudge Tue 09/03 10:53 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TSJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 09/03 10:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Generali Global Assistance, Inc. (TSJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/30 5:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP. (O'Shea, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/30 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Generali Global Assistance, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVIDC-1161256.)filed by Dudley Newman Feuerzeig LLP. (O'Shea, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Engagement Letter,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons