Montana District Court
Case #: 9:24-cr-00046
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 1:24 AM MDT
Defendant
Jake Daniel McClurg (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Tara J. Elliott
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Nov 07 2024
ORDER granting 23 Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture of Property as to Jake Daniel McClurg (1). Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/7/2024. (NOS)
GPO Jan 21 2025
ORDER granting 28 Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture of Property as to Jake Daniel McClurg. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/21/2025. (NOS)
GPO Mar 06 2025
JUDGMENT as to Jake Daniel McClurg (1): Defendant committed to the custody of the BOP for a term of 70 months. Supervised release for 5 years. Fine waived. Special assessment $100. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/6/2025. (NOS)

Docket last updated: 08/31/2024 3:14 AM MDT
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Jake Daniel McClurg (1) count(s) 1. (NOS)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs Redacted Indictment as to Jake Daniel McClurg. (NOS)
Related: [-]
3 3 Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA regarding the1 Indictment (Sealed) as to Jake Daniel McClurg. (NOS)
Related: [-]