Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00438
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 2:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Santos Casas (1)
Represented By
Kristen D. Langford-Harris
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Material Witness
Genrry Josue Cartagena-Martinez
Represented By
Laura Ramos
Law Office Of Laura Allison Ramos
contact info
Material Witness
Cornelio Espinoza-Cruz
Material Witness
Mario Alejandro Mejia-Serna
Represented By
Laura Ramos
Law Office Of Laura Allison Ramos
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ashley Elizabeth Jurk Martin
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/31/2024 3:48 AM CDT
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
Arrest of Jose Santos Casas. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Ashley Elizabeth Jurk Martin appearing for USA, filed. (Martin, Ashley) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Santos Casas (1), filed. (Kenedy) Initial Appearance set for 8/12/2024 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby (gsr2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Cornelio Espinoza-Cruz, Genrry Josue Cartagena-Martinez, Mario Alejandro Mejia-Serna as to Jose Santos Casas. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 8/12/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. (gsr2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Cornelio Espinoza-Cruz, Genrry Josue Cartagena-Martinez, Mario Alejandro Mejia-Serna. Laura Allison Ramos appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (mej2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (mej2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kristen D. Langford-Harris, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jose Santos Casas, filed. (Langford-Harris, Kristen) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) CORNELIO ESPINOZA-CRUZ as to Jose Santos Casas (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 8/12/2024. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., Bond set at $10,000 cash or surety., Additional conditions of bond are as follows: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond; must appear at all court proceedings where it is necessary for you to testify as a witness or notified/subpoenaed to be back in court; provide contact information to his/her attorney and stay in contact with attorney while on release; not violate any new federal, state or local law while on bond; 3rd party custodian approved by USPO; residence approved by USPO prior to release; must inform immigration officials he/she has been designated as a material witness in a criminal case., Rights to consular notification given; material witness or their counsel may notify the Court if they request notification., Material Witness requests the consular officials be notified; case agent to notify officials. Appearances: Liesel Roscher, AUSA; Laura Ramos f/Material Witness; USM: R. Tepera; J. Morris. (Digital # 9:32-9:40) (ERO: Gilbert Rodriguez) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana/used). (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) GENRRY JOSUE CARTAGENA-MARTINEZ as to Jose Santos Casas (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 8/12/2024. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., Bond set at $10,000 cash or surety., Additional conditions of bond are as follows: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond; must appear at all court proceedings where it is necessary for you to testify as a witness or notified/subpoenaed to be back in court; provide contact information to his/her attorney and stay in contact with attorney while on release; not violate any new federal, state or local law while on bond; 3rd party custodian approved by USPO; residence approved by USPO prior to release; must inform immigration officials he/she has been designated as a material witness in a criminal case., Rights to consular notification given; material witness or their counsel may notify the Court if they request notification., Material Witness requests the consular officials be notified; case agent to notify officials. Appearances: Liesel Roscher, AUSA; Laura Ramos f/Material Witness; USM: R. Tepera; J. Morris. (Digital # 9:32-9:40) (ERO: Gilbert Rodriguez) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana/used). (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) MARIO ALEJANDRO MEJIA-SERNA as to Jose Santos Casas (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 8/12/2024. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., Bond set at $10,000 cash or surety., Additional conditions of bond are as follows: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond; must appear at all court proceedings where it is necessary for you to testify as a witness or notified/subpoenaed to be back in court; provide contact information to his/her attorney and stay in contact with attorney while on release; not violate any new federal, state or local law while on bond; 3rd party custodian approved by USPO; residence approved by USPO prior to release; must inform immigration officials he/she has been designated as a material witness in a criminal case., Rights to consular notification given; material witness or their counsel may notify the Court if they request notification., Material Witness requests the consular officials be notified; case agent to notify officials. Appearances: Liesel Roscher, AUSA; Laura Ramos f/Material Witness; USM: R. Tepera; J. Morris. (Digital # 9:32-9:40) (ERO: Gilbert Rodriguez) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana/used). (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Jose Santos Casas (Defendant informed of rights) held on 8/12/2024. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Government moves for detention and requests a continuance. Court grants continuance of the detention hearing. Rights to consular notification given; defendant or counsel may notify the Court if they request notification. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 8/15/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. Appearances: Liesel Roscher, AUSA; Christopher Jenkins for Defendant; USPO: Rebecca Cavazos; USM: R. Tepera; J. Morris. (Digital # 10:04-10:12) (ERO: Gilbert Rodriguez) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Jose Santos Casas. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jose Santos Casas, filed. [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jose Santos Casas, filed. (jc2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION HEARING as to Jose Santos Casas held on 8/15/2024 Testimony presented. Government witness #1 Stephanie Caliguiri. Arguments heard. Court finds probable cause. Detention hearing waived without prejudice. Appearances: Robert Thorpe, AUSA; Kristen Langford-Harris f/Defendant; USPO: Jesus Botello; USM: T. Davis; J. Morris. (Digital # 10:25-10:36) (ERO: Sarah Martin) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Jose Santos Casas ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
9 9 Agreed MOTION to Take Deposition of Material Witnesses by Mario Alejandro Mejia-Serna as to Jose Santos Casas, filed. (Ramos, Laura) [2:24-mj-00374]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
11 11 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jose Santos Casas (1) count(s) 1-3, filed. (lg2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
12 12 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Jose Santos Casas, filed. (lg2)
Related: [-]
13 13 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jose Santos Casas. Motions to Continue the Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial, Motions in Limine, Exhibit and Witness Lists, and Proposed Jury Instructions due no later than three (3) days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Arraignment set for 9/4/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton.. Jury Trial set for 10/7/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (lg2)
Related: [-]