Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 9:24-cr-80107
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Vanessa Rodriguez (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jonathan Bailyn
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/31/2024 6:10 AM EDT
Thursday, August 29, 2024
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 2 restricted/sealed until further notice. (swr)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Allegations as to Vanessa Rodriguez (1) count(s) 1-4. (swr) (swr).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/29/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment
3 3 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Vanessa Rodriguez Initial Appearance set for 8/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before WPB Duty Magistrate Judge. (swr)
Related: [-]