1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez (1). (rbe) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Set/Reset Hearing as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez: Initial Appearance set for 8/14/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Initial Appearance as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez held on 8/14/2024. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 8/14/2024. Arraignment set for 8/28/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 8/19/2024 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 8/28/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-FTL for Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez (Digital 11:32:59) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/14/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
ORDER granting 3 ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/14/2024. See DE 2 for full details. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
DEFENSE ORAL MOTION to Continue Pretrial Detention Hearing as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ORDER granting 5 DEFENSE ORAL MOTION to Continue Pretrial Detention Hearing as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/14/2024. See DE 2 for full details. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
Notice of Assignment of Assistant Federal Public Defender as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez. Attorney Robert Norman Berube added. Attorney Noticing FPD-FTL terminated.. Attorney Robert Norman Berube added to party Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez(pty:dft). (Berube, Robert) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel by Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez (Berube, Robert) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Status RE Pretrial Detention Hearing as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez held on 8/19/2024., Government proceeds by proffer. Agent Joseph Krissel sworn/test. Government and Defense presented argument. Government oral motion for Pretrial Detention. No ruling. Defense oral motion to reset Detention Hearing to speak with the mother from Colorado. Granted. Government oral motion for a Preliminary Hearing. Granted. Court will find probable cause officially tomorrow. (Detention Hearing Continued for 8/20/2024 09:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge., Preliminary Examination set for 8/20/2024 09:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge.). (Digital 10:03:40) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/19/2024). (at) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
ORAL MOTION to Re-set Detention Hearing by Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez. (at) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 10 Motion to Re-set Detention Hearing as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/19/2024). (at) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
ORAL MOTION Preliminary Hearing by USA as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez. (at) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 12 Motion For Preliminary Hearing as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/19/2024). (at) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Detention Hearing as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez not held on 8/20/2024. Court holds defendant, no bond. Order to follow., Preliminary Examination Hearing as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez held on 8/20/2024. Court finds Probable Cause. (Digital 9:36:05) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/20/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
ORAL MOTION for PRETRIAL DETENTION by USA as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez. (smy) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Miscellaneous Hearing as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez held on 8/28/2024. (Digital 11:48:58) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/28/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
ORAL MOTION to Continue Arraignment by USA as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez. (smy) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 17 Motion to Continue Arraignment as to Crystal Gonzalez Dominguez (1). Arraignment reset for 8/30/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination reset for 8/30/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/28/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06389-PAB]
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
INDICTMENT as to Crystal Gonzales Dominguez (1) count(s) 1 and FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS. (smy) (smy).
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(8/29/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment
|
20
|
|
20
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Frank J. Gaviria appearing for Crystal Gonzales Dominguez . Attorney Frank J. Gaviria added to party Crystal Gonzales Dominguez(pty:dft). (Gaviria, Frank)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
MOTION for Termination of Appointment of FPD Robert N. Berube by Crystal Gonzales Dominguez.(Berube, Robert)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Text of Proposed Order on Termination of Appointment as Counsel
|