Puerto Rico District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00256
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:27 AM AST
Defendant
Eric Jonuel Collazo-Colon (1)
Represented By
Melanie Carrillo-Jimenez
Melanie Carrillo-Jimenez Law Office
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation Office
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jenifer Yois Hernandez-Vega
United States Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/31/2024 5:20 AM AST
Thursday, August 01, 2024
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Eric Jonuel Collazo-Colon (1). (mcm)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Case as to Eric Jonuel Collazo-Colon (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega on 8/1/2024. (mcm)
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT as to Eric Jonuel Collazo-Colon (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (mcm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NPV Indictment
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega: Return of Indictment by Grand Jury as to Eric Jonuel Collazo-Colon (1) held on 8/1/2024. Arraignment to be set upon arrest. Arrest warrant to be issued. (Court Reporter DCR.)(Hearing held in OSJ Courtroom 6.) (mcm)
Related: [-]
5 5 *RESTRICTED* Arrest Warrant Issued by US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega in case as to Eric Jonuel Collazo-Colon (1). (mcm)
Related: [-]