Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-03601
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Aug 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 3:38 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kseniya Smychkouskaya
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jacob Vincent Page (1)
Terminated: 08/23/2024
Represented By
Noticing FPD-MIA
contact info
Michael Perry Mirer
Law Office Of Michael Mirer, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/01/2024 4:48 AM EDT
Friday, August 02, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jacob Vincent Page (1). (ogn1)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Order for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Initial Appearance as to Jacob Vincent Page held on 8/2/2024. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 8/2/2024.. Arraignment set for 8/16/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Bond Hearing set for 8/6/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 8/16/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-MIA for Jacob Vincent Page (Digital 14:16:31) (Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/2/2024). (at)
Related: [-]