Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-14484

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sandra R Klein
Case #: 2:24-ap-01216
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2024
Terminated:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Victor Yang
2120 Palos Verdes Dr. West
Palos Verdes Estates, CA 90274
Represented By
Victor Yang
contact info
Defendant
Lyndsey M. Yang
2120 Palos Verdes Dr. West
Palos Verdes Estates, CA 90274
Represented By
Lyndsey M. Yang
contact info
Plaintiff
Erik Fisher
Philip J. Giles c/o Allen, Jones & Giles, PLC 1850 N. Central Avenue Suite 1025
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
Philip J Giles
Allen, Jones & Giles, PLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, December 16, 2024
13 13 court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Mon 12/16 7:30 PM
Receipt of Abstract Filing Fee - $9.00 by KC. Receipt Number 22003316. (admin)
Related: [-]
12 12 court Abstract of judgment Mon 12/16 11:09 AM
Abstract of judgment (COPY); Original issued 12/16/2024. Filed by Philip J. Giles, Attorney for Judgment Creditor (KC2)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
11 11 court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Fri 12/13 7:30 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee ADV- $12.00 by SC. Receipt Number 22003308. (admin)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Request for a Certified Copy (fee) (Internal user) Fri 12/13 1:40 PM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $12. Related [+] (JA)
Related: [-] 7 JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/08 11:18 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-1216 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (TM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Erik Fisher
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 09/11 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 09/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Mon 09/09 7:53 AM
Stipulated Non-Dichargeable Judgment (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 9/9/2024 (TM)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, September 06, 2024
6 6 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 09/06 2:53 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Selth, James. (Selth, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 09/06 10:33 AM
Notice of lodgment of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Erik Fisher Related [+]. (Giles, Philip)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation By Erik Fisher and Victor Yang and Lindsey M. Yang fka Lyndsey Wong / Stipulation for Entry of Non-Dischargeable Judgment and Order Thereon Filed by Plaintiff Erik Fisher filed by Plaintiff Erik Fisher
4 4 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 09/06 10:04 AM
Stipulation By Erik Fisher and Victor Yang and Lindsey M. Yang fka Lyndsey Wong / Stipulation for Entry of Non-Dischargeable Judgment and Order Thereon Filed by Plaintiff Erik Fisher (Giles, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
3 3 court Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case) Tue 09/03 9:45 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/6/2024 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1575, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sandra R. Klein (TM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Erik Fisher
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 09/03 9:40 AM
Summons Issued on Lyndsey M. Yang Date Issued 9/3/2024, Answer Due 10/3/2024; Victor Yang Date Issued 9/3/2024, Answer Due 10/3/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/6/2024 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1575, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sandra R. Klein (TM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Erik Fisher
Friday, August 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/30 4:18 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-01216. Complaint by Erik Fisher against Victor Yang, Lyndsey M. Yang. Fee Amount $350 to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Giles, Philip)
Related: [-]