Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-04753
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:42 AM EST
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
Defendant
Johnson Controls, Inc.
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
Defendant
Milliken & Company
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
Defendant
Innotex Corp
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Veridian Limited
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
CB Garment, Inc.
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Product USA Inc
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Clariant Corp
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairway Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
Plaintiff
Calvin Kimbrough
Represented By
David L Selby, II
Bailey And Glasser
contact info
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
16 16 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 03/26 12:52 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to 2:24-cv-04977-RMG; 2:24-cv-04978-RMG; 2:24-cv-04887-RMG; 2:24-cv-04979-RMG; 2:24-cv-04981-RMG; 2:24-cv-04753-RMG. The Defendants' motions to dismiss (Dkt. No. 6750 and 6753 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) are GRANTED-IN-PART AND DENIED-IN-PART as outlined in the Order. The claims of the Plaintiffs that have provided PFS within the time to respond REMAIN. The claims of the remaining Plaintiffs are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, subject to reinstatement upon the service of executed and completed PFS pursuant to the procedure set forth in CMO No. 5, paragraphs 22 through 26. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/26/2025.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/25 6:33 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re (4 in 2:24-cv-04977-RMG, 4 in 2:24-cv-04978-RMG, 6750 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss For Failure to Serve Turnout Gear Plaintiff Fact Sheets , (4 in 2:24-cv-04887-RMG, 13 in 2:24-cv-04753-RMG, 4 in 2:24-cv-04981-RMG, 4 in 2:24-cv-04979-RMG, 6753 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Serve Turnout Gear Plaintiff Fact Sheets Response filed by W.L. Gore & Associates Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cheffo, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/20 11:44 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re (4 in 2:24-cv-04977-RMG, 4 in 2:24-cv-04978-RMG, 6750 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss For Failure to Serve Turnout Gear Plaintiff Fact Sheets , (4 in 2:24-cv-04887-RMG, 13 in 2:24-cv-04753-RMG, 4 in 2:24-cv-04981-RMG, 4 in 2:24-cv-04979-RMG, 6753 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Serve Turnout Gear Plaintiff Fact Sheets Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Serve Turnout Gear Plaintiff Fact Sheets Response filed by Plaintiffs.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/27/2025 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss Thu 03/06 5:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Serve Turnout Gear Plaintiff Fact Sheets by W.L. Gore & Associates Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/20/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-04753-RMG, 2:24-cv-04887-RMG, 2:24-cv-04979-RMG, 2:24-cv-04981-RMG(Cheffo, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to MTD Failure to Provide TOG PFS - Environmental Litigation Group,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 1.8.25 Letter - ELG
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 01/07 1:30 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
11 11 46 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/19 5:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Calvin Kimbrough. Service due by 2/18/2025 (Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice Other Tue 11/19 4:17 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE This Notice Relates to All Actions as well as to member cases to which this notice was specifically spread. An AMENDED COMPLAINT is to be filed in the member case only . Please be reminded to add any newly named defendant parties as listed on an amended complaint at the time of filing. The attorney filing user is to add each New Party at the appropriate screen prompt -- ECF will prompt with "Please select the party that this filing is against"; the attorney filing user should choose to Add each New Party and then Select each applicable Party at that time. Reference ECF 356. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 11/19 3:36 PM
ORDER The motion to amend (Dkt. No. 6301 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (8) in case 2:24-cv-04753-RMG) is GRANTED and Plaintiff is directed to promptly file the amended complaint. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/19/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-04753-RMG(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
8 8 motion Amend/Correct Thu 10/24 12:38 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct (1 in 2:24-cv-04753-RMG) Complaint by Calvin Kimbrough. Response to Motion due by 11/7/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-04753-RMG(Anderson, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Redlined Amended Complaint
Thursday, October 17, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 10/17 3:42 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 6248 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Motion to Substitute Attorney Gregory A Cade in place of David L Selby, II for Plaintiffs (as listed on the Motion Exhibit A). This Order Relates to granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:23-cv-04384-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04102-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04119-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04138-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04159-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04192-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04249-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04258-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04259-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04270-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04274-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04275-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04315-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04342-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04514-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04515-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04517-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04753-RMG. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/17/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
5 5 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 10/11 12:34 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Rasheed Abdullatif, Taryn Penkala Null, Roger Free, James Winston Anderson, John Allen Dear, Calvin Kimbrough, Randy Allen Bassett, Keith James Marzalen, Crystal Sandoval, John Jex, Jr, Christopher Sensi, Marvin Ernest Ellis, Paula Guidry, Harry Stephen Sellers, Wayne Bearb, James Edward Johnson, Michael Slivkoff, John Slunt. Response to Motion due by 10/25/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Selby, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - list of member cases for substitution of counsel,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, October 07, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/07 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A Cade on behalf of Calvin Kimbrough (Cade, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Wed 09/04 4:45 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 8/30/2024), Kimbrough v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04753-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Minnesota (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/03 10:12 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/03 10:09 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11966049.), filed by Calvin Kimbrough. Service due by 12/2/2024(jbin)
Related: [-]