Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:24-cv-00740
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:16 AM EST
Defendant
American Senior Communities LLC
Represented By
Brett A Hession
Frost Brown Todd Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Anthony W Overholt
Frost Brown Todd Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County
Represented By
Brett A Hession
Frost Brown Todd Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Anthony W Overholt
Frost Brown Todd Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Cooper
Represented By
Bradley Needham
Smith Clinesmith LLP
contact info
Jacob Runyon
Smith Clinesmith LLP
contact info
Robert E Daniell
Smith Clinesmith LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
25 25 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Fri 05/16 7:47 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (ers)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/16 7:47 AM
ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2025 at 10:30 AM ET before Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 6/6/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 5/16/2025. (ers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 05/08 4:58 PM
ANSWER to22 Amended Complaint by American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County.(Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/24 10:38 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County, filed by Susan Cooper.(Daniell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 04/24 9:54 AM
ORDER GRANTING20 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may separately file her proposed amended complaint and exhibits as attached to the instant Motion (20 -1), if filed by 5/16/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 4/23/2025. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
20 20 motion Amend/Correct Tue 01/28 10:40 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Susan Cooper. (Needham, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/25 2:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (In Support of) filed by American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County.(Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Talevski Complaint
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
18 18 respm Response to Motion Tue 10/22 9:00 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Susan Cooper. (Daniell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 10/22 12:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING16 Motion to Stay Discovery by Dfts American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 10/21/2024. (lns) (lns). Modified on 10/22/2024 to attach Order with correct links (lns)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/22/2024) Corrected Order
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
16 16 motion Stay Tue 10/01 4:31 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County. (Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
15 15 24 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 10/01 3:53 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County. (Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 10/01 3:52 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County. (Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/20 4:31 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion over Plaintiff's objection10 . The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED until 10/25/2024. The Court REMINDS the parties of their obligation under Fed. R. Civ. P. 1 as outlined. All parties are ADMONISHED to proceed accordingly to avoid unnecessary delay and expense. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 9/20/2024. (ash)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
12 12 misc Response/Reply Tue 09/17 1:34 PM
RESPONSE by American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County to11 Objection . (Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
11 11 misc Objection Mon 09/16 2:51 PM
OBJECTION by Susan Cooper to10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint . (Daniell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 09/12 12:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Defendants American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County. (Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/12 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A Hession on behalf of American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County (Hession, Brett)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/12 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony W Overholt on behalf of American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County (Overholt, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/10 3:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Cooper. American Senior Communities LLC served on 9/6/2024, answer due 9/27/2024. (Daniell, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/10 3:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Cooper. The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County served on 9/6/2024, answer due 9/27/2024. (Daniell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 09/04 11:56 AM
Summons Issued as to American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/04 11:48 AM
***NEW CASE*** Judge Cristal C Brisco and Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel added. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/03 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Runyon on behalf of Susan Cooper (Runyon, Jacob)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/03 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Needham on behalf of Susan Cooper (Needham, Bradley)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/03 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E Daniell on behalf of Susan Cooper (Daniell, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/03 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against American Senior Communities LLC, The Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5673079.), filed by Susan Cooper.(Daniell, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons