Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ada Brown
Case #: 3:24-cv-02246
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2024
Terminated:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 3:46 AM CST
Defendant
Dawn Callaway
Defendant
DRKM Strategies LLC
Represented By
Anthony M Verna, III
Verna Law PC
contact info
Defendant
Michelle Duvall
Defendant
Duvall S School of Cosmetology LLC
Represented By
Linda P Wills
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Defendant
Stacy Morgan
Represented By
Linda P Wills
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Defendant
Monte Ramey
Represented By
Anthony M Verna, III
Verna Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tamara Wareka
Represented By
Mathew Higbee
Law Offices Of Mathew Higbee
contact info
Steven E Ross
Maxus Legal PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation Wed 12/11 7:37 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Tamara Wareka. (Higbee, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
18 18 order Order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Mon 11/04 4:10 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE - The Court has been notified that this case has settled. The Parties are therefore directed to submit (1) their dismissal papers or (2) a joint status report updating the Court as to the status of the settlement within 60 days from the date of this order. There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and should further proceedings become necessary or desirable, any party or the Court may initiate such further proceedings in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/4/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/01 9:17 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Tamara Wareka (Higbee, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
16 16 order Order Fri 10/25 11:36 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Civil Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where the attorney of record for a party does not reside or maintain their principal office in this district. Within twenty-one days of this Order, Defendants Duvall S School of Cosmetology LLC, Stacy Morgan, DRKM Strategies LLC, and Monte Ramey shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in sanctions being imposed for failure to comply with an order of the Court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/25/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 10/23 7:14 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants Duvall S School of Cosmetology LLC and Stacy Morgan answer due 11/12/2024. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/23/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 10/22 1:57 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Duvall S School of Cosmetology LLC, Stacy MorganAttorney Linda P Wills added to party Duvall S School of Cosmetology LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Linda P Wills added to party Stacy Morgan(pty:dft) (Wills, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 10/22 10:47 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants DRKM Strategies LLC and Monte Ramey answer due 10/31/2024. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/22/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10/21 4:29 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by DRKM Strategies LLC, Monte Ramey (Verna, Anthony)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 10/21 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony M Verna, III on behalf of DRKM Strategies LLC, Monte Ramey. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Verna, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 12, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Sat 10/12 8:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Stacy Morgan ; served on 10/1/2024. (Higbee, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Fri 10/11 5:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Monte Ramey ; served on 9/30/2024. (Higbee, Mathew)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Fri 10/11 5:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to DRKM Strategies LLC ; served on 9/30/2024. (Higbee, Mathew)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Fri 10/11 5:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Duvall S School of Cosmetology LLC ; served on 10/1/2024. (Higbee, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 09/06 11:21 AM
Summons Issued as to Dawn Callaway, DRKM Strategies LLC, Michelle Duvall, Duvall S School of Cosmetology LLC, Stacy Morgan, Monte Ramey. (agc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
5 5 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Thu 09/05 3:52 PM
Request for Clerk to issue SUMMONS filed by Tamara Wareka. (Higbee, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons - Duvall S School - Registered Agent,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons - Michelle Duvall,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons - Dawn Callaway,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons - Stacy Morgan,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons - DRKM Strategies,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons - Monte Ramey
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
4 4 misc Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office Wed 09/04 9:03 AM
Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (cfk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
3 3 qcref Brown Wed 09/04 8:59 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cfk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 09/03 11:52 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Higbee, Mathew)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/03 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against DAWN CALLAWAY, DRKM STRATEGIES LLC, MICHELLE DUVALL, DUVALL S SCHOOL OF COSMETOLOGY, L.L.C., STACY MORGAN, MONTE RAMEY filed by TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14885466) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Higbee, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-G,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet