Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-04762
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:43 AM EST
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairway Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
3M Company
Plaintiff
Karl Butler
Represented By
MaryAnne M Hamilton
Miller Law Group
contact info
William Stacy Miller, II
Miller Law Group
contact info
Ryan McCollum
Whitley Law Firm
contact info
Dakota Lee
Whitley Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Carmen Butler
Represented By
MaryAnne M Hamilton
Miller Law Group
contact info
William Stacy Miller, II
Miller Law Group
contact info
Ryan McCollum
Whitley Law Firm
contact info
Dakota Lee
Whitley Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 05/12 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carmen Butler, Karl Butler Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-04762-RMG(Hamilton, MaryAnne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/03 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Rogers, Margaret Carver, Mark Carver, Donald Hoolahan, Rhonda Hoolahan, Joal Smith, Sheila Smith, Jay Edward Garbus, Robin Garbus, Anita Campos, Carlos Campos, Deborah Rollins, James David Rollins, Jessica Phipps, Shane Phipps, Lorna Cartagena, William Ocariza Cartagena, William Howard Wilkinson, III, Catherine Smith, Joshua Robert Smith, Betty Friendly, Dennis Fitzgerald, Tracy Peace, Jacquelyn Potts Hollis, Marcia Kennelly, Michael John Kennelly, Sarah Burke, William Thomas Burke, Clifford Hall, William Lee Angelo, Jeffrey Mayben, Sara Mayben, Jeannie Richards, Jeffrey Scott Richards, William Andrew Davis, Michelle Lynch, Nathan Edward Lynch, William Lee Sullivan, Letticia Chambers, Shannon Ty Chambers, James Feggestad, Karen Feggestad, Angela Downs, Jeffrey Robert Downs, Richard Carl Bowen, Kevin Michael Gubelman, Carmen Butler, Karl Butler, Bradley Fraser, Rex Ticknor, Vickie Ticknor, Ronald Kevin Shuck, Janie Baltz, Joseph Scott Baltz, Harold Anthony Allen, Michelle Allen, James C. Parker, Robert Anthony Antulov, Julie Clap, Scott Means, David Eugene Randle, II, Jeannette Ralston, Ronnie Ralston, Allison Hargrove, Gregory Michael Hargrove of Kidde-Fenwal Defendants only Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Hamilton, MaryAnne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/18 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dakota Lee on behalf of William Thomas Burke, Sarah Burke, Ronnie Ralston, Jeannette Ralston, William Lee Angelo, Karl Butler, Carmen Butler, Tony Hill, Robin Hill, Jacquelyn Potts Hollis, Jeffrey Scott Richards, Jeannie Richards, Jay Edward Garbus, Robin Garbus, Nathan Edward Lynch, Michelle Lynch, Shane Phipps, Jessica Phipps Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Lee, Dakota)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/25 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan McCollum on behalf of Margaret Carver, Mark Carver, William Lee Angelo, Jeffrey Mayben, Sara Mayben, Jeannie Richards, Jeffrey Scott Richards, Donald Hoolahan, Rhonda Hoolahan, James Feggestad, Karen Feggestad, Carmen Butler, Karl Butler, Rex Ticknor, Vickie Ticknor, Kay Istre, Randall Istre, Robin Hill, Tony Hill, Jacquelyn Potts Hollis, Sarah Burke, William Thomas Burke, Scott Means, Jeannette Ralston, Ronnie Ralston Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(McCollum, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
5 5 misc MDL Member Case Opened Wed 09/11 9:15 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 9/2/2024), Karl Butler & Carmen Butler v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04762-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern Georgia (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/04 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Stacy Miller, II on behalf of William Lee Angelo, Robin Hill, Tony Hill, Jeannie Richards, Jeffrey Scott Richards, Carmen Butler, Karl Butler, Jacquelyn Potts Hollis Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Miller, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/04 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MaryAnne M Hamilton on behalf of William Lee Angelo, Robin Hill, Tony Hill, Jeannie Richards, Jeffrey Scott Richards, Carmen Butler, Karl Butler, Jacquelyn Potts Hollis Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Hamilton, MaryAnne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/03 1:30 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 02, 2024
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/03 1:29 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11966774.), filed by Karl Butler, Carmen Butler. Service due by 12/2/2024 (jbin)
Related: [-]