Jeffrey Scott Richards and Jeannie Richards v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04768 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:43 AM EST |
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairway Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Plaintiff
Jeannie Richards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Scott Richards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Rogers, Margaret Carver, Mark Carver, Donald Hoolahan, Rhonda Hoolahan, Joal Smith, Sheila Smith, Jay Edward Garbus, Robin Garbus, Anita Campos, Carlos Campos, Deborah Rollins, James David Rollins, Jessica Phipps, Shane Phipps, Lorna Cartagena, William Ocariza Cartagena, William Howard Wilkinson, III, Catherine Smith, Joshua Robert Smith, Betty Friendly, Dennis Fitzgerald, Tracy Peace, Jacquelyn Potts Hollis, Marcia Kennelly, Michael John Kennelly, Sarah Burke, William Thomas Burke, Clifford Hall, William Lee Angelo, Jeffrey Mayben, Sara Mayben, Jeannie Richards, Jeffrey Scott Richards, William Andrew Davis, Michelle Lynch, Nathan Edward Lynch, William Lee Sullivan, Letticia Chambers, Shannon Ty Chambers, James Feggestad, Karen Feggestad, Angela Downs, Jeffrey Robert Downs, Richard Carl Bowen, Kevin Michael Gubelman, Carmen Butler, Karl Butler, Bradley Fraser, Rex Ticknor, Vickie Ticknor, Ronald Kevin Shuck, Janie Baltz, Joseph Scott Baltz, Harold Anthony Allen, Michelle Allen, James C. Parker, Robert Anthony Antulov, Julie Clap, Scott Means, David Eugene Randle, II, Jeannette Ralston, Ronnie Ralston, Allison Hargrove, Gregory Michael Hargrove of Kidde-Fenwal Defendants only Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Hamilton, MaryAnne) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Dakota Lee on behalf of William Thomas Burke, Sarah Burke, Ronnie Ralston, Jeannette Ralston, William Lee Angelo, Karl Butler, Carmen Butler, Tony Hill, Robin Hill, Jacquelyn Potts Hollis, Jeffrey Scott Richards, Jeannie Richards, Jay Edward Garbus, Robin Garbus, Nathan Edward Lynch, Michelle Lynch, Shane Phipps, Jessica Phipps Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Lee, Dakota) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan McCollum on behalf of Margaret Carver, Mark Carver, William Lee Angelo, Jeffrey Mayben, Sara Mayben, Jeannie Richards, Jeffrey Scott Richards, Donald Hoolahan, Rhonda Hoolahan, James Feggestad, Karen Feggestad, Carmen Butler, Karl Butler, Rex Ticknor, Vickie Ticknor, Kay Istre, Randall Istre, Robin Hill, Tony Hill, Jacquelyn Potts Hollis, Sarah Burke, William Thomas Burke, Scott Means, Jeannette Ralston, Ronnie Ralston Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(McCollum, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 09/11 9:25 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 9/2/2024), Jeffrey Scott Richards and Jeannie Richards v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04768-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Georgia (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by William Stacy Miller, II on behalf of William Lee Angelo, Robin Hill, Tony Hill, Jeannie Richards, Jeffrey Scott Richards, Carmen Butler, Karl Butler, Jacquelyn Potts Hollis Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Miller, William) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MaryAnne M Hamilton on behalf of William Lee Angelo, Robin Hill, Tony Hill, Jeannie Richards, Jeffrey Scott Richards, Carmen Butler, Karl Butler, Jacquelyn Potts Hollis Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Hamilton, MaryAnne) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin) |
|
Monday, September 02, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11966777.), filed by Jeffrey Scott Richards, Jeannie Richards. Service due by 12/2/2024 (jbin) |