Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tana Lin
Case #: 3:24-cv-05729
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 1:29 AM PST
Consol Counter Claimant
Karen Lavin
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Counter Claimant
Deren Flesher
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Counter Claimant
Indiana Water Technology LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Counter Claimant
Kdawg Crypto LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Counter Claimant
Colewstech LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Counter Claimant
Basant Kumar
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Counter Claimant
Ronald N Cole
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Counter Claimant
Chaurishi Retail Enterprises LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Counter Claimant
Rcwstech 1157 llc
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Counter Claimant
Royal Reservoirs LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Counter Claimant
David A Schroeder
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Counter Claimant
Sarah Schroeder
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Defendant
Karen Lavin
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Defendant
Sarah Schroeder
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Defendant
Basant Kumar
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Defendant
Rcwstech 1157 llc
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Defendant
Kdawg Crypto LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Defendant
Royal Reservoirs LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Defendant
Indiana Water Technology LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Defendant
David A Schroeder
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Defendant
Deren Flesher
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Defendant
Colewstech LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Defendant
Chaurishi Retail Enterprises LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Defendant
Ronald N Cole
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Third Party Plaintiff
Indiana Water Technology LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Third Party Plaintiff
Sarah Schroeder
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Third Party Plaintiff
David A Schroeder
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Third Party Plaintiff
Royal Reservoirs LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Third Party Plaintiff
Rcwstech 1157 llc
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Third Party Plaintiff
Chaurishi Retail Enterprises LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Third Party Plaintiff
Karen Lavin
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Third Party Plaintiff
Ronald N Cole
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Third Party Plaintiff
Basant Kumar
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Third Party Plaintiff
Colewstech LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Third Party Plaintiff
Kdawg Crypto LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Consol Third Party Plaintiff
Deren Flesher
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Counter Claimant
BLC Water Company LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Counter Defendant
First Fed Bank
Represented By
Devon John McCurdy
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Dailey Koga
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Andrew Gordon Yates
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Gregory R Fox
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Larina H Chu
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Defendant
Brian S Chu
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Defendant
BLC Water Company LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
First Fed Bank
Represented By
Devon John McCurdy
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Dailey Koga
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Andrew Gordon Yates
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Gregory R Fox
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
First Fed Bank
Represented By
Devon John McCurdy
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Dailey Koga
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Andrew Gordon Yates
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Gregory R Fox
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
BLC Water Company LLC
Represented By
Kristen Faye Barnhart
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Jack Lovejoy
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
John T Bender
K&l Gates Llp (wa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Wed 12/18 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Andrew Gordon Yates. Filed by Plaintiff First Fed Bank, ThirdParty Defendant First Fed Bank, Counter Defendant First Fed Bank. (Yates, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
24 24 order Consolidation Order - for Lead case only ~Util - Case Stayed Tue 12/03 12:39 PM
ORDER. Defendants' Motion (C24-5729, Dkt. No.7 ) to consolidate and stay these actions is GRANTED. Case Nos. C24-5730, C24-5731, C24-5732, C24-5736, and C24-1389 are CONSOLIDATED into Case No. C24-5729; all future pleadings and other papers shall be filed in only Case No. C24-5729 and captioned as "First Fed Bank v. BLC Water Company LLC, et al." in the Tacoma Division of the Western District of Washington. This now consolidated action is hereby STAYED pursuant to Brillhart v. Excess Insurance Co. of America , 316 U.S. 491 (1942), and its progeny, until further Order of the Court. The parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report on the earliest of: (a) six (6) months after the date of this Order and every six (6) months thereafter, or (b) within fourteen (14) days after resolution of (i) BLC Water Co., LLC v. First Fed Bank , King County Superior Court Case No. 24 2-20247 1 SEA, (ii) First Fed Bank v. Pacific Water Technology, LLC , King County Superior Court Case No. 24 2-19871 7 SEA, or (iii) First Fed Bank v. Founders Mosaic Partners, LLC , King County Superior Court Case No. 24 2-12567 1 SEA. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Unavailability Tue 11/26 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel John T Bender for Defendants BLC Water Company LLC, Brian S Chu, Larina H Chu, ThirdParty Plaintiff BLC Water Company LLC, Counter Claimant BLC Water Company LLC from November 29, 2024 - December 13, 2024 and December 23, 2024 - December 27, 2024. (Bender, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Unavailability Tue 11/19 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Jack Lovejoy for Defendant Brian S Chu from December 18, 2024 to December 27, 2024. (Lovejoy, Jack)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
21 21 misc Jury Demand Wed 11/13 2:41 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants BLC Water Company LLC, Brian S Chu, Larina H Chu, ThirdParty Plaintiff BLC Water Company LLC, Counter Claimant BLC Water Company LLC (Bender, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
20 20 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 11/12 6:56 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by BLC Water Company LLC. (Bender, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
19 19 misc Appendix Thu 10/31 3:09 PM
APPENDIX re18 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendants BLC Water Company LLC, Brian S Chu, Larina H Chu (Bender, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Wed 10/30 8:24 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against First Fed Bank, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff First Fed Bank by BLC Water Company LLC.(Bender, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/01 2:43 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants BLC Water Company LLC, Brian S Chu, Larina H Chu, TO RESPONSE to7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay Six Declaratory Judgment Actions Filed by First Fed (Lovejoy, Jack)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
16 16 respm Response to Motion Wed 09/25 10:24 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff First Fed Bank, to7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay Six Declaratory Judgment Actions Filed by First Fed .(Yates, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 20, 2024
15 15 respm Declaration Fri 09/20 12:04 PM
Supplemental DECLARATION of John Bender filed by Defendants BLC Water Company LLC, Brian S Chu, Larina H Chu re7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay Six Declaratory Judgment Actions Filed by First Fed(Bender, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
14 14 order TL Minute Order re Chambers Procedures Wed 09/18 12:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at[LINK:https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures] . All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
Related: [-]
13 13 order TL Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Wed 09/18 12:25 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned to Judge Mon 09/16 2:20 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Tana Lin as related to C24-1164TL. Judge John H. Chun no longer assigned to the case. (AD)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
12 12 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 09/13 8:27 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on BLC WATER COMPANY LLC, BRIAN S. CHU and LARINA H. CHU on 9/12/2024, filed by Plaintiff First Fed Bank. (Yates, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 09/13 8:19 AM
DISREGARD - SEE 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on BLC WATER COMPANY LLC, BRIAN S. CHU and LARINA H. CHU on 9/12/2024, filed by Plaintiff First Fed Bank. (Yates, Andrew) Modified on 9/13/2024 to strike docket entry at request of filer (KB)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 09/13 7:58 AM
DISREGARD - SEE 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on BLC WATER COMPANY LLC, BRIAN S. CHU and LARINA H. CHU on 9/12/2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Yates, Andrew) Modified on 9/13/2024 to strike docket entry at request of filer (KB)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Text Modification Fri 09/13 8:59 AM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re11 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint,10 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint: Modified on 9/13/2024 to strike docket entries filed in error. See12 for correct filing. (KB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 09/12 8:43 AM
Attorneys Jack Lovejoy, Kristen Faye Barnhart added for BLC Water Company LLC, Brian S Chu, Larina H Chu, per Defendants'9 Notice of Appearance. (SB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/11 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John T Bender on behalf of Defendants BLC Water Company LLC, Brian S Chu, Larina H Chu. (Bender, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
8 8 respm Declaration Tue 09/10 8:59 PM
DECLARATION of John T. Bender filed by Defendants BLC Water Company LLC, Brian S Chu, Larina H Chu re7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay Six Declaratory Judgment Actions Filed by First Fed(Bender, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit T,
Att: 21 Exhibit U,
Att: 22 Exhibit V,
Att: 23 Exhibit W
7 7 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 09/10 8:54 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay Six Declaratory Judgment Actions Filed by First Fed , filed by Defendants BLC Water Company LLC, Brian S Chu, Larina H Chu. Noting Date 10/1/2024, (Bender, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Consolidate and Stay Six Declaratory Judgment Actions Filed by First Fed
Friday, September 06, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Pendency of Other Action Fri 09/06 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in USDC W. Washington, case number(s) in other court number 2:24-cv-01164-TL, 3:24-cv-05736-BHS, 3:24-cv-05732, 3 24-05730 3:24-cv-05731, and 2:24-cv-01389; filed by Plaintiff First Fed Bank. (McCurdy, Devon)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 09/06 9:12 AM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent First Northwest Bancorp for First Fed Bank. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by First Fed Bank. (Yates, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
4 4 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Thu 09/05 4:55 PM
CORRECTED Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 9/10/2024. (CDA)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Thu 09/05 5:07 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/12/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(CDA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 09/04 11:51 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) BLC Water Company LLC, Brian S Chu, Larina H Chu.(CJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued - B Chu,
Att: 2 Summons Issued - L Chu
2 2 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 09/04 11:38 AM
** Reminder ** Documents omitted re1 Complaint,. Notice of Pendency of Other Action. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CJS)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/04 11:42 AM
Judge John H. Chun added. (CJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/03 12:07 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) BLC Water Company LLC, Brian S. Chu, Larina H. Chu Related [+] filed by First Fed Bank.(McCurdy, Devon)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8610384
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons